OMS Hospitality Group, Inc.
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth D Katz |
Case #: | 3:22-bk-30426 |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2022 |
Creditor Meeting: | Dec 13, 2022 |
Claims Deadline: | Jan 24, 2023 |
Debtor
OMS Hospitality, Inc.
176 Shoemaker Ln
Agawam, MA 01001-3689 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of the U. S. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608 |
|
Trustee
Gary M. Weiner
Weiner Law Firm, P.C. 1441 Main Street Suite 610
Springfield, MA 01103 |
Docket last updated: 11/16/2022 12:02 AM EST |
Tuesday, November 15, 2022 | ||
crditcrd
none
Tue 11/15 1:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 22-30426 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A19848176, amount $ 338.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 11/15 1:11 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing Fee in the Amount of $338 Filed by OMS Hospitality, Inc.. (O'Connor, Andrea) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Tue 11/15 1:11 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Debtor OMS Hospitality, Inc. (O'Connor, Andrea) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Tue 11/15 1:11 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Andrea M. O'Connor in the amount of $3750. Plus $0 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor OMS Hospitality, Inc. (O'Connor, Andrea) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Signature Page
Tue 11/15 1:15 PM
Signature Page filed by Debtor OMS Hospitality, Inc. (O'Connor, Andrea) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Vote
Tue 11/15 1:16 PM
Certificate of Vote filed by Debtor OMS Hospitality, Inc. (O'Connor, Andrea) |
|
6 | 6
motion
For Order/Authority
Tue 11/15 1:22 PM
Expedited Motion filed by Debtor OMS Hospitality, Inc. For Order to Designate Responsible Person to Prepare and File Required Documents with certificate of service. (O'Connor, Andrea) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors 7b(Assets) (Use For Auto Assign Only)
Tue 11/15 4:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled on 12/13/2022 at 09:00 AM as a Telephonic Meeting. Proofs of Claims due by 1/24/2023. (ajta) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order/Authority
Tue 11/15 4:27 PM
Endorsed Order dated 11/15/2022 Re:6 Expedited Motion filed by Debtor OMS Hospitality, Inc. For Order to Designate Responsible Person to Prepare and File Required Documents. EXPEDITED DETERMINATION DENIED FOR INSUFFICIENT GROUNDS. A HEARING ON THIS MOTION WILL BE SET IN THE NORMAL COURSE. (pf) |
|
9 | 9
court
Hearing Scheduled (Form Attached)
Tue 11/15 4:39 PM
Hearing Scheduled on 12/13/2022 at 10:30 AM at Springfield Courtroom - Berkshire Re:6 Motion of Debtor to Designate Responsible Person to prepare and file required documents. Objections due by 12/08/22 at 4:00PM (spr) |