Stanley et al v. The Phoenix Insurance Company
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Claude M Hilton |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01308 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Fairfax County, CL-22-0013784 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 16, 2023 5:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Phoenix Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Stanley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Stanley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
So Ordered
Mon 05/15 5:00 PM
So Ordered in re15 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 5/15/2023. (nlop) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 05/02 3:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal [Joint] by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Mumford, John) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Settlement (by Attorney)
Mon 04/10 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Joseph Stanley, Theresa Stanley (Shields, William) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Thu 04/06 3:51 PM
Amended MOTION to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph Stanley, Theresa Stanley.(Shields, William) |
|
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Memorandum | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/03 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Gilbert Shields on behalf of Joseph Stanley, Theresa Stanley (Shields, William) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 03/31 1:34 PM
Memorandum in Support re10 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Joseph Stanley, Theresa Stanley.(Shields, William) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
10 | 10
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 03/31 1:32 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Joseph Stanley, Theresa Stanley. (Shields, William) |
|
9 | 9
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 03/31 12:55 PM
Memorandum in Support re8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Stanley, Theresa Stanley.(Shields, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K | ||
8 | 8
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 03/31 12:49 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Joseph Stanley, Theresa Stanley. (Shields, William) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
5
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Wed 12/28 3:39 PM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Proposed Joint Discovery Plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (Joint Discovery Plan) (Dkt. 6) and at the initial pretrial conference held on December 28, 2022 and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Dkt. 5), the court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by April 14, 2023. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved, as amended herein, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. 3. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by January 4, 2023. 4. Expert disclosures shall be governed by the deadlines set forth in the Joint Discovery Plan. To the extent the parties wish to modify these deadlines, they must seek leave of court. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 12/28/22. (tfitz, ) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 12/28 3:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/28/2022. Appearances of counsel via phone. Joint Discovery Plan is adopted. Order to follow. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Discovery Plan
Wed 12/21 1:38 PM
Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by The Phoenix Insurance Company.(Gosline, Meghan) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/02 3:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/28/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Discovery due by 4/14/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 12/02/2022.(jlan) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice | ||
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/22 11:57 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by The Phoenix Insurance Company.(Mumford, John) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/17 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Elizabeth Gosline on behalf of The Phoenix Insurance Company (Gosline, Meghan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 11/17 1:58 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Mumford, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 11/17 1:56 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8665760.), filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company.(Mumford, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 11/18 5:19 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Dest) |