Dean v. Unknown
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth W Hanes |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00484 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question Bivens-Prisoner |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 01/17 12:07 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Tevin Ronaldo Dean re6 and7 . (jmey, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 01/16 11:12 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Tevin Ronaldo Dean re5 . (jmey, ) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 12/08 4:11 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 12/8/2023. (jmey, ) |
|
6 | 6
order
Dismissal Order (1983)
Fri 12/08 4:10 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER. It is ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Dismissal Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 12/8/2023. Copies mailed 12/8/2023.(jmey, ) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/31 9:47 AM
ORDER. If Plaintiff wishes for the Court to consider this matter, Plaintiff is ORDERED to either (i) pay both the $350.00 statutory filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee (a total of $402.00) or (ii) complete and sign the enclosed in forma pauperis application and sign the enclosed Consent to Collection of Fees form and then RETURN BOTH TO THE COURT, within twenty-one (21) days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order, a copy of the Court's in forma pauperis application, a copy of the Consent to Collection of Fees form, and a copy of the document titled "Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint" to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 10/30/2023. Copies mailed 10/31/2023.(jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Consent to Collection of Fees form and Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Application in Support of Request to Proceed in forma Pauperis | ||
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 12/16 4:31 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff is ORDERED to sign and resubmit the Complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order, along with page 1 of Plaintiff's1 Complaint to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 12/16/2022. Copies mailed 12/16/2022.(jmey, ) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Fri 12/02 4:23 PM
Amendment to1 Complaint by Tevin Ronaldo Dean. (jmey, ) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt
Thu 11/17 3:05 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Prisoner (1983)
Thu 11/17 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Unknown (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Tevin Ronaldo Dean.(jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |