Davis v. Apple Federal Credit Union
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | T S Ellis, III |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01312 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 16, 2023 5:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
Apple Federal Credit Union
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon E. Davis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
order
So Ordered
Mon 08/21 9:07 AM
So Ordered in re24 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jon E. Davis. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/18/2023. (tran) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/18 2:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jon E. Davis. (Brown, Carla) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/27 4:59 PM
ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled for Friday, August 4, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELED . It is further ORDERED that on or before Friday, August 18, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. the parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal which dismisses all of plaintiff's claims with prejudice without further order from this Court. If for some reason the parties ultimately do not reach a formalized settlement agreement, the parties shall have until September 22, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. to move to reopen this matter. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/27/2023. (tran) |
|
utility
1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/27 5:01 PM
***Summary Judgment Hearing set for 08/04/2023 at 10:00 AM is CANCELED. See Dkt.23 . (tran) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (other)
Fri 07/21 1:50 PM
NOTICE by Jon E. Davis [Joint Notice of Pending Dismissal of Action] (Brown, Carla) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Mon 07/10 10:12 AM
Notice of Hearing Date re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Zech, Kristin) |
|
utility
1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/10 9:38 AM
***Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/13/2023 at 04:00 PM - Cancelled, as per TSE Chambers. (tran) |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 07/10 9:48 AM
Notice of Correction re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Unfortunately the motion was filed without a Notice of Hearing Date. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date, or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (Dest) |
||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/10 1:40 PM
Set Deadline as to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (wgar, ) |
||
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 07/07 10:46 PM
Memorandum in Support re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Federal Credit Union.(Zech, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-10, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 11-39, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 40-55, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 56-82 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 07/07 10:41 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Apple Federal Credit Union. (Zech, Kristin) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Protective Order
Tue 06/06 10:44 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER - Re Handling and Labeling of Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 06/06/2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.(wgar, ) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Protective Order
Mon 06/05 5:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Apple Federal Credit Union. (Smith, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/09 3:14 PM
ORDER granting14 MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests. ORDERED that Defendant shall serve its responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on or before March 13, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 03/09/2023. (wgar, ) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 03/09 1:58 PM
Memorandum in Support re14 Consent MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests filed by Apple Federal Credit Union. (Smith, Andrew) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Thu 03/09 1:57 PM
Consent MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by Apple Federal Credit Union.(Smith, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
5
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Mon 02/13 12:30 PM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made in the Rule 26(f) Joint Proposed Discovery Plan ("Joint Discovery Plan") (Docket no. 12), and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 11), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/13/2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, ) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Discovery Plan
Fri 02/10 4:43 PM
Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Jon E. Davis.(Brown, Carla) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/31 11:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Discovery due by 6/23/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (If the parties do not file dispositive motions). Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (If the parties do file dispositive motions). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 01/31/2023. (tran) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice | ||
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/30 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Smith on behalf of Apple Federal Credit Union (Smith, Andrew) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/27 11:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Apple Federal Credit Union.(Zech, Kristin) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 01/09 10:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jon E. Davis Apple Federal Credit Union served on 1/6/2023, answer due 1/27/2023 (Brown, Carla) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/21 12:34 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to Apple Federal Credit Union, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Dest, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 12/13 12:18 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jon E. Davis as to Apple Federal Credit Union. (Brown, Carla) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Tue 12/13 12:04 PM
Notice of Correction re5 Summons Returned Unexecuted. Unfortunately, the document is incomplete. The filing user has been notified to refile the summons returned unexecuted with the service of process section completed. (Dest) |
||
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 12/12 11:11 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jon E. Davis as to Apple Federal Credit Union. (Brown, Carla) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 12/12 11:06 AM
Notice of Correction re4 Proposed Summons. Unfortunately, the Clerk's office is unable to issue the summons at this time. The previously issued summons have not been returned to the Clerk's office "executed" or "unexecuted". (Dest) |
||
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/29 3:40 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint [CORRECTED] by Jon E. Davis. (Brown, Carla) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/21 2:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Apple Federal Credit Union, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(nneb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 11/21 2:24 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (nneb) |
||
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 11/17 5:14 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Jon E. Davis. (Brown, Carla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/17 5:11 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8666737.), filed by Jon E. Davis.(Brown, Carla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |