Celltas Bio, Inc.
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher J Panos |
Case #: | 1:22-bk-11671 |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2023 |
Debtor
Celltas Bio, Inc.
PO Box 81250
Wellesley Hills, MA 02481-0411 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
|
Trustee
Joseph G. Butler
Law Office of Joseph G. Butler 355 Providence Highway
Westwood, MA 02090 |
Docket last updated: 11/18/2022 12:02 AM EST |
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 11/17 10:15 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 22-11671 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A19850746, amount $ 338.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 11/17 10:07 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing Fee in the Amount of $338 Filed by Celltas Bio, Inc.. (Cruickshank, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Electronic Filing | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement
Thu 11/17 10:09 AM
Statement of Federal Tax Identification Number filed by Debtor Celltas Bio, Inc. (Cruickshank, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Electronic Filing | ||
3 | 3
court|misc
Matrix|Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix
Thu 11/17 10:10 AM
Matrix, Verification of Creditor Matrix filed by Debtor Celltas Bio, Inc. (Cruickshank, Gary) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order to Update
Thu 11/17 3:01 PM
Order to Update Re:1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Disclosure of Ownership Statement Rule 1007(a)(1) , Atty Disclosure Statement , Schedules A-H ,Statement of Financial Affairs , Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 12/1/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 12/1/2022. (nr) |