Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Leitman
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:22-cv-12776
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 15, 2023 7:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Reaheal Washington
Defendant
Lara Nercessian
Defendant
Eric Decker Thomas
Defendant
Dawn White
Defendant
Kenyetta Jones
Defendant
Alexandra Wolf
Defendant
Eric Hollis
Defendant
Jarmaire R. McEntire
Plaintiff
Ronald James Cooks
8187 Busch
Centerline, MI 48015
Plaintiff
Minnie Bell Price
8187 Busch
Centerline, MI 48015
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Michigan Department of Treasury
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Michigan, State of
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Tonti Morgan
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Eric Sabrae
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Arnoldo Vetencourt
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Sonya Walker, MI
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Melmo Investment LLC
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Wayne County Jail
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Wayne County Prosecutor Office
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Department
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Wayne County Tax Assesor
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Olexander Kucheryavyy
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Detroit Police Department
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Emily Elijah
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Cathy M. Garrett
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Ruth Ann Garrett
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Lyle Harris
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Kenyetta Stanford Johnson
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Rodney Johnson
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Joseph Louis Kurly
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
36th District Circuit Court
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Marc D. Landau
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
David Lawson
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Jonath Mapp, Jr
Terminated: 11/28/2022
Defendant
Kai McDuffie
Terminated: 11/28/2022

GPO Feb 28 2023
ORDER Dismissing Action Without Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
GPO Feb 28 2023
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)

Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
13 13 order Judgment* Tue 02/28 1:20 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Dismissing Case Tue 02/28 1:19 PM
ORDER Dismissing Action Without Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 02/28 1:40 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re12 Order Dismissing Case,13 Judgment on Ronald James Cooks and Minnie Bell Price at 8187 Busch, Centerline, MI 48015. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
11 11 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 02/28 8:47 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Minnie Bell Price. (SKra)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
10 10 order Show Cause Mon 01/23 11:25 AM
ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Show Cause in Writing Why Court Should Not Dismiss Their Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 2/27/2023. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 01/23 11:27 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re10 Order to Show Cause on Ronald James Cooks and Minnie Bell Price at 8187 Busch, Centerline, MI 48015. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
9 9 trial Exhibit Fri 12/16 2:28 PM
EXHIBITS by Plaintiff (SSch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
8 8 trial Exhibit Tue 12/06 4:24 PM
EXHIBITs by Minnie Bell Price. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
7 7 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Tue 11/29 12:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against Eric Hollis, Jarmaire R. McEntire, Lara Nercessian, Eric Decker Thomas, Reaheal Washington, Dawn White, Kenyetta Jones, Alexandra Wolf. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Mon 11/28 1:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT [NOTICE OF REMOVAL] filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
5 5 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Mon 11/21 11:04 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
4 4 misc Docket Annotation Fri 11/18 12:22 PM
AMENDED civil cover sheet by Minnie Bell Price. (TTho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 11/17 12:56 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Ronald James Cooks. (SSch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 11/17 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Minnie Bell Price, Ronald James Cooks against All Defendants [Plaintiff wanted docketed as a Notice of Removal] (SSch)
Related: [-]