Rhoades v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry E Hudson |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00728 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 18:1345 Injunctive and Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday May 19, 2023 8:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States Army Corps of Engineers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Rhoades
5286 Pickett River Drive
Henrico, VA 23231 |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 06/13 4:17 PM
ORDER that Defendant's4 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiff's7 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 6/13/2023. Copy mailed to Plaintiff as directed. (jsmi, ) |
|
11 | 11
14
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Tue 06/13 4:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 6/13/2023. Copy mailed to Plaintiff as directed. (jsmi, ) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Opposition
Fri 06/02 5:03 PM
Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Rhoades. (jsmi, ) |
|
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification | ||
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Opposition
Mon 02/06 4:44 PM
Opposition to7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
12
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 01/24 11:16 AM
Memorandum in Support of7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Rhoades. (jsmi, ) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 01/24 11:15 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by William Rhoades. (jsmi, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Roseboro Notice
Wed 12/21 11:20 AM
Roseboro Notice as to Motion for Summary Judgment by United States Army Corps of Engineers (Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
5 | 5
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 12/21 11:20 AM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers.(Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
4 | 4
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 12/21 11:18 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/21 11:17 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by United States Army Corps of Engineers.(Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 11/18 11:38 AM
Summons Issued as to United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Clerk handed summons to Plaintiff along with Rule 4 and Instructions on serving the defendants. (jjones, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/18 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT against United States Army Corps of Engineers (Filing fee $402, receipt number 34683055036.), filed by William Rhoades.(jjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Service Addresses, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 9 Local Rule 83.1, | ||
Att: 10 Receipt |