Ecology Mir Group, LLC v. Charter Bus Pros, Inc.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01315 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Mar 03, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday May 19, 2023 7:17 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Charter Bus Pros, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Ecology Mir Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charter Bus Pros, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ecology Mir Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 04/27 4:02 PM
ORDER granting22 the parties' Consent Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 04/27/2023. (dvanm) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss
Thu 04/27 12:13 PM
Consent MOTION to Dismiss as Settled by Charter Bus Pros, Inc..(Whitticar, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order of Dismissal | ||
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 04/10 5:25 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Ecology Mir Group, LLC.(Tate, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
5
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Thu 03/30 10:22 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Proposed Joint Discovery Plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (Joint Discovery Plan) (Dkt. 17) and at the initial pretrial conference held on March 29, 2023 and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Dkt. 14), the court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by July 14, 2023. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved, as amended herein, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. 3. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed on or before April 12, 2023. 4. Expert disclosures shall be governed by Local Civil Rule 26(D). Specifically, expert disclosures shall be due from plaintiff by May 15, 2023, and from defendants by June 14, 2023. Rebuttal reports from plaintiff, if any, shall be due by June 29, 2023. To the extent the parties wish to modify these deadlines, they must seek leave of court. 5. If the parties believe that a settlement conference with the court would be of assistance in resolving this dispute, they may arrange a settlement conference by contacting the undersigned magistrate judges chambers. (see Order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 3/29/23. (tfitz, ) |
|
19 | 19
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Wed 03/29 2:50 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 03/29/2023. (dvanm) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 03/30 10:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick:Initial Pretrial Conference held via phone on 3/29/2023. Appearance of counsel. Joint Discovery Plan is adopted as amended. Order to follow. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Protective Order
Tue 03/28 12:20 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order as Stipulated by Parties by Ecology Mir Group, LLC.(Tate, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order | ||
17 | 17
misc
Discovery Plan
Tue 03/28 12:19 PM
Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Ecology Mir Group, LLC.(Tate, Christopher) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 03/20 4:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) , COUNTERCLAIM against Ecology Mir Group, LLC by Charter Bus Pros, Inc..(Whitticar, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/06 6:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charter Bus Pros, Inc., filed by Ecology Mir Group, LLC.(Tate, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 03/03 2:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick.Discovery due by 7/14/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/3/23.(yguy) |
|
Att: 1 Mag.Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Exclude Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/03 2:07 PM
ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion [Dkt. No. 9] is GRANTED IN PART as to the request to file an amended complaint and DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS, and it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff immediately file its proposed Amended Complaint (Exhibit 1 to its Motion); and it is further ORDERED that the defendant file an answer or responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint within 14 days of plaintiff filing the Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 03/03/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 03/02 4:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION Relief from Order, Amend Judgment, Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Charter Bus Pros, Inc.. (Whitticar, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Waiver of
Mon 02/27 6:11 PM
Waiver of re9 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION Relief from Order, Amend Judgment, Leave to Amend Complaint Waiving Oral Argument Only by Ecology Mir Group, LLC (Tate, Christopher) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 02/27 9:50 AM
Notice of Correction re9 MOTION to Alter Judgment, MOTION to Amend/Correct , MOTION Relief from Order, Amend Judgment, Leave to Amend Complaint . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm) |
||
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 02/24 3:39 PM
Memorandum in Support re9 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION Relief from Order, Amend Judgment, Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Ecology Mir Group, LLC.(Tate, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Disclosure | ||
9 | 9
motion
Alter Judgment Amend/Correct Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Fri 02/24 3:37 PM
MOTION to Alter Judgment , MOTION to Amend/Correct , MOTION Relief from Order, Amend Judgment, Leave to Amend Complaint by Ecology Mir Group, LLC. (Tate, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 02/21 4:23 PM
ORDERED that the Complaint [Dkt. No. 1] be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/21/2023. (dvanm) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Waiver of
Tue 02/21 2:25 PM
Waiver of re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Waiver of Oral Argument only by Charter Bus Pros, Inc. (Whitticar, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Fri 02/17 8:55 AM
Notice of Correction re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 02/10 3:55 PM
RESPONSE in Support re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Charter Bus Pros, Inc.. (Whitticar, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 02/10 3:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Charter Bus Pros, Inc.. (Whitticar, Michael) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/15 8:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ecology Mir Group, LLC. Charter Bus Pros, Inc. waiver sent on 12/12/2022, answer due 2/10/2023. (Tate, Christopher) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/21 10:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Charter Bus Pros, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 11/18 2:52 PM
Proposed Summons by Ecology Mir Group, LLC. (Tate, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/18 2:50 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8668484.), filed by Ecology Mir Group, LLC.(Tate, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 11/21 10:25 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (dvanm) |