Fox v. DCO LLC et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jamar K Walker |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00120 |
Nature of Suit | 368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for Newport News, VA, CL2203839B-00 |
Last checked: Friday May 19, 2023 5:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Eaton Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wyeth Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Waco, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Boeing Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shell Oil Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pneumo Abex LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Parker-Hannifin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
IMO Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Honeywell International Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Henkel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goodrich Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DCO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Eldon Fox, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Hexcel Corporation
Terminated: 12/16/2022
|
|
Defendant
General Electric Company
Terminated: 03/31/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |