Borders v. Ford Motor Company
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca Beach Smith |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00121 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Williamsburg/James City County, CL22001951-00 |
Last checked: Friday May 19, 2023 7:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Ann Borders
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Fri 01/20 11:04 AM
Letter to Williamsburg/James City County Circuit Court re: remand of case CL22001951-00. (jhie, ) |
|
7 | 7
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Fri 01/20 10:55 AM
ORDER OF REMAND. The court REMANDS the action to the Circuit Court of Williamsburg/James City County, Virginia, and GRANTS Plaintiff's5 Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The Court DENIES Defendant's request to have Plaintiff execute an affidavit limiting her recovery amount, and also DENIES Plaintiff's request for the award of costs and any actual expenses, including attorneys' fees, resulting from the removal action. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 1/20/23. (jhie, ) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Opposition
Mon 12/12 4:51 PM
Opposition to5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ford Motor Company. (MacFarlane, Angela) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 11/29 6:32 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Julie Ann Borders.(Feinman, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Mag Notice / Judge Information
Fri 11/18 4:22 PM
Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 11/18 3:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (MacFarlane, Angela) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/18 3:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(MacFarlane, Angela) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 11/18 3:33 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8668686.), filed by Ford Motor Company.(MacFarlane, Angela) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 22 pgs Exhibit Complaint | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 11/18 4:22 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) |
||
misc
Refer for 16 b
Fri 11/18 4:26 PM
Referred for 16(b). (epri, ) |