Zeme et al v. United States Department of State et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert E Payne |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00730 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday May 19, 2023 7:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Antony Blinken
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Consular Officers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Washington, DC 20528
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rachel Schofer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
G.D USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Indrit Myrtaj
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Davide Nostran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicolas Tibaldi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danilo Verrecchia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommaso Zeme
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/20 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by G.D USA, Inc., Indrit Myrtaj, Davide Nostran, Nicolas Tibaldi, Danilo Verrecchia, Tommaso Zeme (Gluckman, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate Reporting Service
Tue 12/06 11:52 AM
Certificate Reporting Service by Rachel Schofer, United States Department of State, United States Department of Homeland Security, Consular Officers, Antony Blinken, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. All Defendants. (Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/06 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of Antony Blinken, Consular Officers, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Rachel Schofer, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State (Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 12/05 12:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by G.D USA, Inc., Danilo Verrecchia, Nicolas Tibaldi, Indrit Myrtaj, Tommaso Zeme, Davide Nostran. All Defendants. (Gluckman, David) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 11/21 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Antony Blinken, Consular Officers, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Rachel Schofer, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (jjones, ) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 11/21 10:10 AM
Notice of Correction re2 Proposed Summons filing attorney advised propose summons needed for Attorney General of the United States. (jjones, ) |
||
Saturday, November 19, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Sat 11/19 5:48 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by G.D USA, Inc.. (Gluckman, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Sat 11/19 5:43 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by G.D USA, Inc., Indrit Myrtaj, Davide Nostran, Nicolas Tibaldi, Danilo Verrecchia, Tommaso Zeme. (Gluckman, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 11/19 5:36 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8669480.), filed by G.D USA, Inc., Danilo Verrecchia, Nicolas Tibaldi, Indrit Myrtaj, Tommaso Zeme, Davide Nostran.(Gluckman, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 11/21 9:52 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jjones, ) |