22
|
|
22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 12/14 10:28 AM
ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Honorable C. Kailani Memmer on 12/14/2023. (sln)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 12/11 2:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Disclosures by Hugh's Body Shop, Inc.. Motions referred to Judge C. Kailani Memmer.(Grubb, Alicha)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order Order
|
20
|
|
20
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 10/12 9:27 AM
ORAL Order Referring Case to the Honorable C. Kailani Memmer. All non-dispositive pretrial motions and issues in this case shall be and are hereby REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge C. Kailani Memmer, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on October 12, 2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (mc)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
NOTICE of Hearing: (N) Status Conference set for November 22, 2022 at 3:00 PM by telephone conference before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Notice of Filing Requirement to Blue Diamond Transportation, LLC, Falcon Transportation, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response.[LINK:Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form.] This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ams)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Electronic Summons Issued as to Hugh's Body Shop, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (ams)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against Hugh's Body Shop, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4077039.), filed by Falcon Transportation, LLC, Blue Diamond Transportation, LLC.(ams)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 4
Garageman's Lien Bond,
|
| |
Att: 5
Proposed Order,
|
| |
Att: 6
Civil Cover Sheet
|