Ketsela v. Mayorkas, et al.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01327 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/16 4:46 PM
ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in re8 Stipulation of Dismissal filed. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 2/16/2023. (Dest) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 02/15 1:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kim Zanotti. (Spavins, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 01/25 3:34 PM
ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED this matter is STAYED until Plaintiff's Application to Register Permanent Residence is adjudicated; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report every sixty (60) days during the pendency of the stay. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 01/25/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stay
Mon 01/23 11:08 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kim Zanotti.(Spavins, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/23 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Spavins on behalf of Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kim Zanotti (Spavins, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 11/28 4:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibits served on US Attorney EDVA on 11/23/2022, filed by Yonas Tegene Ketsela.(Miller, Stevan) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt Confirmation of Delivery | ||
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 11/21 8:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kim Zanotti, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(Dest, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 11/21 2:52 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus by YONAS TEGENE KETSELA. (Miller, Stevan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Mon 11/21 2:35 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by YONAS TEGENE KETSELA.(Miller, Stevan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Combined Exhibits | ||
misc
Electronic Fee Payment - 402.00 Fee*
Mon 11/21 2:36 PM
Electronic Fee Payment - as to1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus by YONAS TEGENE KETSELA. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8671894.. (Miller, Stevan) |
||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 11/21 8:15 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Dest) |