Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company v. Legynd Transportation, LLC
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond A Jackson |
Referred: | Robert J Krask |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00122 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday May 20, 2023 7:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
Legynd Transportation, LLC
|
|
Intervenor Defendant
Latasha Eley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Pretrial Statement
Wed 04/10 11:58 AM
Pretrial Statement (Exhibits and Witness Lists) by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Status Report
Tue 04/09 10:07 AM
STATUS REPORT by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Settlement (by Attorney)
Tue 04/09 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Partial Settlement by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company (Robey, Daniel) |
|
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/09 8:36 AM
ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to submit to the chambers of the undersigned, no later than noon on April 10, 2024, the following: 1. A proposed Final Pretrial Order signed by both parties. 2. Copies of any de bene esse depositions to which the parties have made objections. See Order for details. Copies of this Order sent on 4.9.24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 4/8/24. (epri, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 04/02 11:18 AM
ORDER: Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask for all further proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 4/2/24. (epri, ) |
|
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 04/03 7:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller:Settlement Conference held on 4/2/2024. (cdod, ) |
||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 03/21 4:40 PM
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson re15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Legynd Transportation, LLC , filed by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. Daniel Robey appeared on behalf of plaintiff Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. Brian Casey and Boyd Scarborough appeared on behalf of intervenor defendant Latasha Eley. No appearance by defaulted defendant Legynd Transportation, LLC. Comments of the Court. Arguments of counsel heard. The Court will take the matter under advisement. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Jill Trail, OCR) (bap, ) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/21 9:05 AM
Set/Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing re:15 MOTION for Default Judgment reset for 3/21/2024 at 2:30 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. *Courtroom Change Only* (bap, ) |
||
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (other)
Thu 03/14 2:25 PM
NOTICE by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company Notice of Filing(Robey, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Deposition Transcript | ||
33 | 33
order
Settlement Conference Order
Thu 03/14 1:49 PM
Settlement Conference Order: All parties and their lead counsel are required to appear before the undersigned via Zoomgov remote proceedings for a settlement conference at 9:30 a.m. on April 1, 2024; memorandum due by noon on March 28, 2024. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 3/14/24. (epri, ) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Waiver of
Thu 03/14 11:16 AM
Waiver of Trial by Jury by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company (Robey, Daniel) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 03/14 11:12 AM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 4/1/2024 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk Remote before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (cdod, ) |
||
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/07 1:56 PM
Motion Hearing set as to15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Legynd Transportation, LLC for 3/21/2024 at 2:30 p.m. in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (bap, ) |
||
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (other)
Tue 01/02 3:12 PM
NOTICE by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company Notice of Subpoena (Robey, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 12/14 12:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Ali & Sons Virginia, LLC on 11/29/2023, filed by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
||
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 12/14 12:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Legynd Transportation, LLC on 11/29/2023, filed by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Thu 12/14 2:55 PM
Notice of Correction re 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena; 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena. Documents 29 and 30 are discovery documents and have been removed. Pursuant to FRCP 5(d) and/or the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, discovery material is not to be filed. (epri, ) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 11/13 1:40 PM
Notice of Correction re 26 NOTICE, 27 NOTICE, 28 NOTICE. Documents 26, 27 and 28 are discovery documents and have been removed. Pursuant to FRCP 5(d) and/or the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, discovery material is not to be filed. (epri, ) |
||
Friday, November 10, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (other)
Fri 11/10 4:48 PM
NOTICE by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company Notice of Subpoena to Ali & Sons of Virginia through Registered Agent Hassan Elmi Ali(Robey, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Subpoena to Ali & Sons of Virginia through Registered Agent Hassan Elmi Ali | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice (other)
Fri 11/10 4:46 PM
NOTICE by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company Notice of Subpoena to Legynd Transportation, LLC through Registered Agen Hassan Elmi Ali(Robey, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Subpoena to Legynd Transportation, LLC through Registered Agen Hassan Elmi Ali | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (other)
Fri 11/10 4:36 PM
NOTICE by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company Notice of Subpoena to Custodian of Records, Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles(Robey, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Subpoena to Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles | ||
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
4
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Thu 10/19 5:04 PM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference, it is ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/11/2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Norfolk. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Norfolk. The parties are ORDERED to schedule a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge on or before the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/18/2023. (bap, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference-Rule16b
Wed 10/18 12:04 PM
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16(b) held on 10/18/2023. (bap, ) |
||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 10/13 11:30 AM
Reset Hearings: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference reset for 10/18/2023 at 9:30 a.m. via Zoomgov. (bap, ) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Rule 26 Disclosure
Mon 10/09 6:01 PM
Rule 26 Disclosure by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order
Mon 10/02 2:58 PM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2023 at 09:30 a.m. via Zoomgov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 10/2/2023. (bap, ) |
|
misc
Refer for 16 b
Mon 10/02 10:09 AM
Referred for 16(b). (epri, ) |
||
Saturday, September 30, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sat 09/30 12:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Latasha Eley.(Casey, Brian) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Intervene
Mon 09/18 4:08 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Motion to Intervene is GRANTED, ECF. Nos. 11, 18. Copies of this Order sent as DIRECTED on 9.18.23. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 9/18/23. (epri, ) |
|
Saturday, August 26, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Request for Hearing
Sat 08/26 11:59 AM
Request for Hearing by Latasha Eley re11 MOTION to Intervene ,18 MOTION to Intervene (for entry of order granting unopposed motion to intervene) (Casey, Brian) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Brief in Support
Thu 08/03 10:14 AM
Brief in Support to18 MOTION to Intervene (for entry of order granting unopposed motion to intervene) filed by Latasha Eley. (Casey, Brian) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Intervene
Thu 08/03 10:13 AM
MOTION to Intervene (for entry of order granting unopposed motion to intervene) by Latasha Eley.(Casey, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order granting motion to intervene | ||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Request for Hearing
Fri 07/14 10:21 AM
Request for Hearing by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company re15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Legynd Transportation, LLC with Roseboro,. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
16 | 16
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 07/14 10:20 AM
Memorandum in Support re15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Legynd Transportation, LLC with Roseboro,. filed by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 07/14 10:19 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Legynd Transportation, LLC with Roseboro,. by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Declaration
Wed 02/08 4:33 PM
Declaration by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 02/08 11:37 AM
RESPONSE in Support re11 MOTION to Intervene filed by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Brief in Support
Mon 02/06 11:21 AM
Brief in Support to11 MOTION to Intervene filed by Latasha Eley.(Casey, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Answer to complaint | ||
11 | 11
motion
Intervene
Mon 02/06 11:19 AM
MOTION to Intervene by Latasha Eley. (Casey, Brian) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 01/09 2:48 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant, Legynd Transportation, LLC, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for failure to file an answer in this action. This default is noted on the Court's docket this date. (epri, ) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 01/09 12:06 PM
NOTICE by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company of Mailing (Robey, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Entry of Default
Mon 01/09 12:05 PM
Request for Entry of Default as to by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Mon 01/09 12:03 PM
STATUS REPORT by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 01/09 9:44 AM
Clerk's NOTICE to Counsel for answer status (epri, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/03 7:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company Legynd Transportation, LLC served on 12/16/2022, answer due 1/6/2023 (Robey, Daniel) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/21 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Legynd Transportation, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
3 | 3
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 11/21 2:28 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 11/21 2:26 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/21 2:13 PM
Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8671553.), filed by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company.(Robey, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 11/21 3:19 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) |