Puharic et al v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01329 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2023 6:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Puharic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorraine Puharic
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 04/26/2023
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Terminated: 05/10/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 06/14 3:31 PM
ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 06/14/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/13 3:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic. (Kelly, Kristi) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/10 12:28 PM
ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC in re22 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/10/2023. (swil) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/05 4:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC by Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic. (Kelly, Kristi) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/26 5:10 PM
ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC in re20 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Equifax Information Services, LLC . Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 4/26/2023. (Dest) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 04/25 3:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic. (Kelly, Kristi) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
5
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Wed 02/08 12:20 PM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made in the Joint Discovery Plan (Docket no. 18), and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 17), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/08/2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Discovery Plan
Tue 02/07 1:49 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic.(Kelly, Kristi) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/19 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. Discovery due by 6/9/2023. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/19/2023.(tarm) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/13 5:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Anthony, David) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/12 2:32 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Wright, Gibson) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/12 2:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Wright, Gibson) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/06 4:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Montgomery, John) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 12/19 2:27 PM
ORDER granting in Part10 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time; ORDERED that Defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall be GRANTED an extension of time until on or before January 13, 2023, to file its responsive pleadings to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/19/2022. (jlan) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/19 10:48 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 12/19 10:47 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Anthony, David) |
|
Att: 1 Agreed Order | ||
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 12/16 10:05 AM
ORDER granting in part7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC shall have up to and including January 9, 2023, (four week extension) to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/16/2022. (wgar) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/15 4:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, John) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 12/15 4:38 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Montgomery, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/29 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick McNichol on behalf of Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic (McNichol, James) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/29 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Cahoon Kelly on behalf of Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic (Kelly, Kristi) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/29 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Guzzo on behalf of Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic (Guzzo, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/23 2:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Dest, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 10:12 AM
Proposed Summons by Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic. (Nash, Casey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/22 10:11 AM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8673540.), filed by Anthony Puharic, Lorraine Puharic.(Nash, Casey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/23 2:24 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Dest) |