Jebai, et al. v. Mayorkas, et al.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael S Nachmanoff |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01330 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1255 Immigration |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2023 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kirt Thompson
Director, Texas Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Texas Service Center 6046 N Belt Line Rd
Irving, TX 75038 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Simon Fakhry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randa Jebai
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/07 7:34 AM
ORDERED that the parties' Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal (Dkt. No. 7) is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 2/6/2023. (swil) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 02/03 1:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson. (Spavins, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 01/31 11:58 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that Defendants will respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before March 1, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/31/2023. (wgar, ) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of
Mon 01/30 12:58 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson.(Spavins, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/30 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Spavins on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson (Spavins, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 11/23 2:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(Dest, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 4:24 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus by SIMON FAKHRY, RANDA JEBAI. (Moran, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Tue 11/22 4:14 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by RANDA JEBAI, SIMON FAKHRY.(Moran, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Electronic Fee Payment - 402.00 Fee*
Tue 11/22 4:27 PM
Electronic Fee Payment - as to1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus,2 Proposed Summons by SIMON FAKHRY, RANDA JEBAI. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8675086.. (Moran, Thomas) |
||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/23 2:36 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Dest) |