Bailey v. Mediko, Inc. et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Krask |
Referred: | Robert J Krask |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00488 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2023 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Virat Bakhshi, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mediko, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randolph Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/11 1:21 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This matter shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 7/11/2023. (dbra, ) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Mon 07/10 11:03 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Robert J. Krask.18 MOTION to Dismiss (dbra, ) |
||
Sunday, July 09, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss
Sun 07/09 9:50 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Randolph Bailey.(Booth, Edwin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Fri 03/03 1:37 PM
Amended Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Jury Trial set for 9/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask and filed on 3/3/2023. (btit) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 03/03 10:28 AM
Telephone Conference held on 3/3/2023 before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (btit) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/27 2:47 PM
Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Telephonically before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (btit) |
||
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 02/02 11:08 AM
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 2/2/2023. (dbra, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
6
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Wed 02/01 4:08 PM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/1/2023 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk. Jury Trial is set for 9/13/2022 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 2/1/2023. (tamarm, ) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Consent/Decline to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/01 2:32 PM
Joint Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Virat Bakhshi, M.D., Mediko, Inc.. (Brewer, Taylor) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference-Rule16b
Wed 02/01 2:39 PM
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 2/1/2023. (tamarm, ) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order
Wed 01/11 9:51 AM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2023 at 10:00 AM by conference call to be initiated by counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/9/2023. (tamarm, ) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2022 | ||
misc
Refer for 16 b
Fri 12/30 11:22 AM
Refer for 16(b) (afar) |
||
Thursday, December 29, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/29 11:39 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Virat Bakhshi, M.D..(Morley, Katherine) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/29 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Morley on behalf of Virat Bakhshi, M.D. (Morley, Katherine) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/29 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Denslow Brewer on behalf of Virat Bakhshi, M.D. (Brewer, Taylor) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 12/19 4:00 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Randolph Bailey as to Mediko, Inc.. (Booth, Edwin) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 12/19 3:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randolph Bailey Virat Bakhshi, M.D. served on 12/13/2022, answer due 1/3/2023 (Booth, Edwin) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/06 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Elizabeth Morley on behalf of Mediko, Inc. (Morley, Katherine) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/06 11:53 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mediko, Inc.. (Brewer, Taylor) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/06 11:52 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Mediko, Inc..(Brewer, Taylor) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/06 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Denslow Brewer on behalf of Mediko, Inc. (Brewer, Taylor) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/22 3:59 PM
Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Virat Bakhshi, M.D., Mediko, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 3:36 PM
Proposed Summons by Randolph Bailey. (Booth, Edwin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/22 3:12 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8674670.) , filed by Randolph Bailey.(Booth, Edwin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 11/22 3:48 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, ) |