Huang v. Mayorkas et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01317 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2023 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Plaintiff
Lei Huang
1460 Hampton Hill Cir
McLean, VA 22101 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
order
So Ordered
Wed 12/14 4:25 PM
So Ordered re3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lei Huang. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/14/2022. (dvanm) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 12/14 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lei Huang.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 11/25 12:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Dest) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/22 2:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 14683097702.), filed by Lei Huang.(Dest) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |