MA v. Mayorkas, et al.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Trenga |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01332 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2023 6:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Associate Director Jennifer B Higgins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Associate Director Ted Kim
Washington, DC 20529
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M. A.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
So Ordered
Tue 03/28 1:22 PM
So Ordered in re16 Joint STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (CORRECTED) . Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/28/2023. (Dest) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 03/28 10:59 AM
Joint STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal (CORRECTED) by Jennifer B Higgins, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas (O'Connor, Kirstin). Modified to correct docket event on 3/28/2023 (Dest) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 03/28 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennifer B Higgins, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas (O'Connor, Kirstin) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Tue 03/28 1:13 PM
Notice of Correction re15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Unfortunately, document number has a case number that does not correspond to the case in which you filed. Please refile the document in the correct case. (Dest) |
||
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 02/13 5:09 PM
ORDER granting13 Joint MOTION to Stay; and it is further ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, STAYED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/13/2023. (Dest) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stay
Thu 02/09 5:52 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Jennifer B Higgins, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas.(O'Connor, Kirstin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/09 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kirstin O'Connor on behalf of Jennifer B Higgins, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas (O'Connor, Kirstin) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 12/12 12:35 PM
Civil Cover Sheet re1 Complaint by MA. (Kohler Maya, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 11/28 2:58 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Paul John O'Dwyer for MA. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/28/2022. (nneb) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 11/28 9:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Jennifer B Higgins, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(nneb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 11/28 9:20 AM
Notice of Correction re1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified that the civil cover sheet was not the correct document and an was in incorrectly saved pdf fillable form and to refile the correct form (nneb) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/22 4:19 PM
First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul O'Dwyer and Certification of Local Counsel Elizabeth Kohler Maya Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8675058. by MA. (Kohler Maya, Elizabeth) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 4:15 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by MA. (Kohler Maya, Elizabeth) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 4:09 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by MA. (Kohler Maya, Elizabeth) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 4:08 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by MA. (Kohler Maya, Elizabeth) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 4:07 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by MA. (Kohler Maya, Elizabeth) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 4:07 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by MA. (Kohler Maya, Elizabeth) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 4:06 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by MA. (Kohler Maya, Elizabeth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/22 4:05 PM
Complaint I:22-cv-1332 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8674949.), filed by MA.(Kohler Maya, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 11/28 9:12 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (nneb) |