Baxter v. Becerra, et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael S Nachmanoff |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01336 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2023 5:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Christi A Grimm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Timothy Baxter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Fri 02/03 9:22 AM
ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that this case shall be transferred to the Richmond Division of this Court.13 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 2/2/2023. (swil) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice (other)
Thu 02/02 12:15 PM
NOTICE by Xavier Becerra, Christi A Grimm re13 MOTION to Transfer Case to Richmond Division re Waiver of Hearing (Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Transfer Case
Thu 02/02 12:14 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to Richmond Division by Xavier Becerra, Christi A Grimm.(Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/31 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Christi A Grimm (Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 12/27 3:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Baxter. All Defendants. (Moss, Brandon) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 12/05 1:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Christi A Grimm, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(nneb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Fri 12/02 8:12 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jeremy Joseph Broggi for Timothy Baxter. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/1/2022. (nneb) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Fri 12/02 8:10 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Thomas Michael Johnson, Jr for Timothy Baxter. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/1/2022. (nneb) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 11/30 3:12 PM
Proposed Summons to Attorney General of the United States and to U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 11/30 11:47 AM
Notice of Correction. The filing user has been notified to file proposed summons for the U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia (nneb) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 6:08 PM
Proposed Summons Christi A. Grimm by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/22 6:07 PM
Proposed Summons of Sec. Xavier Becerra by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/22 5:35 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas M. Johnson and Certification of Local Counsel Brandon J. Moss Filing fee $ 75, receipt number CVAEDC-8675246. by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/22 5:16 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy J. Broggi and Certification of Local Counsel Brandon J. Moss Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8675209. by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/22 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Jacob Moss on behalf of Timothy Baxter (Moss, Brandon) |
|
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/22 4:54 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8675133.), filed by Timothy Baxter.(Moss, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/30 11:40 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (nneb) |