Texas Northern District Court
Judge:James Wesley Hendrix
Case #: 1:22-cv-00176
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2022
Terminated:Dec 21, 2022
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2023 5:14 AM CDT
Defendant
Roman Mihailuta
Represented By
Matthew Ryan Gelina
Hartline Barger LLP
contact info
Jake Ramsey
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer
contact info
Defendant
Kaunas Trucking Inc
Represented By
Matthew Ryan Gelina
Hartline Barger LLP
contact info
Jake Ramsey
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer
contact info
Defendant
RM Trucking LLC
Represented By
Matthew Ryan Gelina
Hartline Barger LLP
contact info
Jake Ramsey
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Fernau
Represented By
Spencer P Browne
Reyes Browne Reilley
contact info
Hussain Muhammad Ismail
Reyes Browne Reilley
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 03/06 2:30 PM
**DISREGARD - File in Incorrect Case**Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Kaunas Trucking Inc, Roman Mihailuta, RM Trucking LLC. (Helmey, David) Modified on 3/6/2024: email to filer re proper case (amg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 12/30 11:46 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kaunas Trucking Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Ramsey, Jake) (Main Document 5 replaced after flattening on 12/30/2022) (amg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division Wed 12/21 4:34 PM
ORDER. Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue2 . Because the defendant inadvertently removed this case to the wrong division within the Northern District of Texas, the case should be transferred to the proper division. Accordingly, the Court grants the motion and transfers this case to the Dallas Division. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 12/21/2022) (skf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer (Public Entry) Wed 12/21 5:06 PM
Case copied to 3:22-cv-2874. Transfer to Dallas Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 12/13 12:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Derek Fernau. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Browne, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
2 2 motion Transfer Case Out of District/Division Wed 11/23 11:20 AM
MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Kaunas Trucking, Inc., Roman Mihailuta, RM Trucking, LLC (Ramsey, Jake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 11/22 6:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Kaunas Trucking, Inc., RM Trucking, LLC, Roman Mihailuta. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13322901) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ramsey, Jake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) List,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) J