Kassman v. Kijakazi
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arenda L Wright Allen |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00489 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/12 2:37 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the sealed administrative record filed in this action be returned to counsel for the defendant. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 3/12/24. (mrees) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 08/08 3:25 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (mrees) |
|
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/08 3:11 PM
FINAL ORDER: Plaintiff's12 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, and the Commissioner's request to affirm the final decision of the Commissioner (ECF No. 15) is GRANTED. The final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED, and this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 8/8/23. (mrees) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 07/14 4:37 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kilolo Kijakazi,12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan M. Kassman. Objections to R&R due by 7/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 7/14/23. (mrees) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Wed 04/26 3:39 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Miller.15 MOTION for Summary Judgment,12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (mrees) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Brief in Support
Mon 04/10 9:53 PM
Brief in Support of Defendant's Decision Denying Disability Benefit and in Opposition re 12 filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Hartlieb, Garry) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 03/15 3:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Office of General Counsel served on 3/6/2023. (mrees) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Brief in Support
Thu 03/09 4:11 PM
Brief in Support to12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dylan M. Kassman. (Gillikin, Robert) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 03/09 4:11 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dylan M. Kassman.(Gillikin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Tue 02/14 10:38 AM
ORDER: The Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a brief for the requested relief on or before March 13, 2023. The defendant shall file a brief on or before 30 days from the filing of plaintiff's brief. The Plaintiff may file a reply on or before 14 days of the filing of defendant's brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 2/14/23. (mrees, ) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations
Mon 02/13 12:56 PM
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller for Report and Recommendations. See Order for further directives. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 2/13/23. (mrees, ) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Administrative Record (Social Security Cases Only)
Mon 02/13 11:56 AM
Administrative Record. (mrees, ) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/10 9:01 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Kilolo Kijakazi.(Hartlieb, Garry) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 12/19 4:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney served on 12/14/2022. (mrees, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 12/06 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 12/5/2022. (mrees, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 11/29 3:08 PM
Three (3) Summons Issued and delivered to USM as to SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(mrees, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedure, | ||
Att: 2 USM 285 Forms | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/29 2:22 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES: IT IS ORDERED that the application is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue summons, and the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon the defendant(s), as directed by the plaintiff. All cost of service shall be advanced by the United States. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 11/29/22. (mrees, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 11/23 9:29 AM
Proposed Summons All 3 Proposed Summonses with Form 285s by Dylan M. Kassman.(Gillikin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Form 285s | ||
2 | 2
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Wed 11/23 9:29 AM
MOTION In Forma Pauperis re1 Complaint by Dylan M. Kassman. (Gillikin, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/23 9:28 AM
Complaint , filed by Dylan M. Kassman.(Gillikin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/23 2:52 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) |