Abo Elganam v. MAYORKAS et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01341 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1255 Immigration |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2023 5:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Attorney General Merrick Garland
Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kirt Thompson
Texas Service Center 6046 N Belt Line Rd
Irving, TX 75038 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary of DHS Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Mamdouh Abo Elganam
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
So Ordered
Tue 02/21 3:18 PM
So Ordered in re7 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson, Ur M. Jaddou. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/21/2023. (show) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 02/21 1:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson. (Baumhart, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 01/18 2:16 PM
ORDERED that the parties' motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until further order of this Court; and it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file status reports with this Court every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order in re5 Joint MOTION to Stay. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/18/2023. (show) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Wed 01/18 11:48 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson.(Baumhart, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/18 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter B. Baumhart on behalf of Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson (Baumhart, Peter) |
|
Friday, November 25, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 11/25 5:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Kirt Thompson, and U.S. Attorney. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(jlan) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 11/25 5:29 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (jlan) |
||
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 11/23 1:54 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Mamdouh Abo Elganam. (Moran, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Wed 11/23 1:53 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Mamdouh Abo Elganam.(Moran, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Electronic Fee Payment - 402.00 Fee*
Wed 11/23 1:55 PM
Electronic Fee Payment - as to2 Proposed Summons,1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Mamdouh Abo Elganam. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8676485.. (Moran, Thomas) |