West Neck Community Association, Inc. v. JBWK, LLC
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth W Hanes |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00491 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Beach General District Court, GV22020807-00 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2023 5:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
JBWK, LLC
McIntyre Stein & Ashby, PLLC 101 W. Main Street, Ste. 920
Norfolk, VA 23510 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
West Neck Community Association, Inc.
Pender & Coward, PC 222 Central Park Avenue Ste. 400
Virginia Beach, VA 23462 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
63 | 63
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 12:58 PM
ORDER setting schedule for renewed motions for summary judgment. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 4/11/24. (jhie, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
62 | 62
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 04/10 3:08 PM
ORDER granting59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Solomon Hunter Ashby, Jr terminated as counsel for JBWK, LLC. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 4/10/24. (jhie, ) |
|
61 | 61
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 04/10 1:27 PM
Minute Entry: Status Conference held before District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. Mark Baumgartner appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. John McIntyre appeared on behalf of the defendant. Comments of the Court and counsel. Counsel answered questions of the Court. The Court outlined a briefing schedule for renewed motions for summary judgment; Order to issue memorializing same. (Court Reporter Jill Trail, OCR) (bap, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
60 | 60
2
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 04/09 4:45 PM
Memorandum in Support re59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by JBWK, LLC, JBWK, LLC. (Ashby, Solomon) |
|
59 | 59
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/09 4:43 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JBWK, LLC, JBWK, LLC.(Ashby, Solomon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 04/08 3:48 PM
LOCATION CHANGE Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/10/2024 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 5 before District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. (kgall) |