Proven Industries, Inc. v. Altor Locks, LLC et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | T S Ellis, III |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01342 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1125 Lanham Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2023 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Altor Locks, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dylan Cato
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Karen Schaufeld
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Proven Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 01/11 2:57 PM
ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in re11 STIPULATION of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 1/11/2023. (Dest) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/11 12:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Proven Industries, Inc..(Tacconi, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/03 3:10 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (wgar, ) |
||
Friday, December 30, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Fri 12/30 4:46 PM
Notice of Hearing Date January 27, 2023 re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Johnson, Lance) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 12/30 4:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Altor Locks, LLC, Dylan Cato, Karen Schaufeld.(Johnson, Lance) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 11/29 4:12 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Mark James Young for Proven Industries, Inc.. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/28/2022. (nneb) |
|
Friday, November 25, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/25 6:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Altor Locks, LLC, Dylan Cato, Karen Schaufeld, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Dest, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 11/23 4:02 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Proven Industries, Inc.. (Tacconi, Anthony) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 11/23 4:02 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Proven Industries, Inc.. (Tacconi, Anthony) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 11/23 4:01 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Proven Industries, Inc.. (Tacconi, Anthony) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/23 3:57 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark J. Young and Certification of Local Counsel Anthony Tacconi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8676928. by Proven Industries, Inc.. (Tacconi, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/23 3:55 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Proven Industries, Inc.. (Tacconi, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/23 3:53 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number CVAEDC-8676867.), filed by Proven Industries, Inc..(Tacconi, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex.D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex.I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. J, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 11/25 5:53 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Dest) |