Hanshow America Inc. et al v. SES-imagotag GmbH
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01345 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2023 5:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
SES-imagotag GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hanshow America Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/29 8:28 AM
ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/28/2024. (swil) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 03/27 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd. (Hnath, Gary) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/11 11:57 AM
ORDERED that the parties' file supplemental briefs on their position regarding consolidation under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), not to exceed 15 pages, on or before April 1, 2024; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be STAYED pending briefing on consolidation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 03/08/2024. (see order for details)(dvanm) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Request for Hearing
Thu 03/07 2:15 PM
Request for Hearing by SES-imagotag GmbH / UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (Farr, Alec) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/07 2:08 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by SES-imagotag GmbH. (Farr, Alec) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 03/04 11:50 AM
ORDER granting35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Kenneth Mroz; Constantine Gregory Gramenopoulos and Kelly Horn terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 03/01/2024. (dvanm) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/29 5:10 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for C. Gregory Gramenopoulos, David K. Mroz and Kelly S. Horn by SES-imagotag GmbH. (Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 02/21 3:27 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Grant Kinsel for SES-imagotag GmbH. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 2/21/2024. (swil) |
|
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 02/21 3:26 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Matthew Joseph Moffa for SES-imagotag GmbH. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 2/21/2024. (swil) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/20 8:54 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Grant Kinsel and Certification of Local Counsel Alec W. Farr Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9372877. by SES-imagotag GmbH. (Farr, Alec) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/20 7:53 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J. Moffa and Certification of Local Counsel Alec W. Farr Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9372839. by SES-imagotag GmbH. (Farr, Alec) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/20 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alec Winfield Farr on behalf of SES-imagotag GmbH (Farr, Alec) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 10/12 1:10 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Clark Sebastian Bakewell terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 10/12/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 10/09 11:15 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Clark Bakewell by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd..(Hnath, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/11 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Horn on behalf of SES-imagotag GmbH (Horn, Kelly) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 05/08 10:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 Memorandum in Support,22 Opposition,21 Notice of Hearing Date, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SES-imagotag GmbH.(Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Gregory Gramenopoulos In Support of Reply, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 5 | ||
utility
1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/08 10:03 AM
*** Motion Hearing deadline terminated - Per RDA's chambers motion set for 5/24/23 will be decided on the papers; no oral argument will be heard (tarm) |
||
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/04 8:47 AM
ORDERED that SES-imagotag GmbH shall have an additional four (4)calendar days to respond to Hanshow's Opposition, extending its dead line to respond from May 4, 2023. to May 8, 2023 in re23 Motion to Extend theDeadline to Respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 05/03/2023. (dvanm) |
|
24 | 24
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 05/03 12:36 PM
Memorandum in Support re23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 Memorandum in Support,22 Opposition,21 Notice of Hearing Date, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SES-imagotag GmbH. (Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 05/03 12:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 Memorandum in Support,22 Opposition,21 Notice of Hearing Date, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SES-imagotag GmbH.(Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Opposition
Fri 04/28 10:36 PM
Opposition to17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd..(Hnath, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/18 7:54 AM
Set Deadline as to17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (wgar, ) |
||
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Mon 04/17 3:23 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for May 24, 2023 re18 Memorandum in Support, Notice of Correction,17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 04/17 10:40 AM
Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to refile the notice of hearing which requests a Wednesday date in re20 Notice of Hearing Date. (wgar, ) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Fri 04/14 7:04 PM
Notice of Hearing Date May 19, 2023 at 10:00 am re18 Memorandum in Support,17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/14 5:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SES-imagotag GmbH. (Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
18 | 18
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 04/14 5:06 PM
Memorandum in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by SES-imagotag GmbH.(Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 04/14 5:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SES-imagotag GmbH.(Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 01/30 2:58 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Zhangyuan Ji for Hanshow America Inc.,Zhangyuan Ji for Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/30/2023. (swil) |
|
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 01/30 2:55 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Shen Wang for Hanshow America Inc.,Shen Wang for Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/30/2023. (swil) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 01/30 2:53 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Hao Tan for Hanshow America Inc.,Hao Tan for Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/30/2023. (swil) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/27 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Kenneth Mroz on behalf of SES-imagotag GmbH (Mroz, David) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/27 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Constantine Gregory Gramenopoulos on behalf of SES-imagotag GmbH (Gramenopoulos, Constantine) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 01/25 10:49 AM
NOTICE by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd. Regarding Service(Hnath, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/24 5:35 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Zhangyuan Ji and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8768732. by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. (Hnath, Gary) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/24 5:33 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Shen Wang and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8768729. by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. (Hnath, Gary) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/24 5:28 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Hao Tan and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8768714. by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. (Hnath, Gary) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/20 12:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. SES-imagotag GmbH waiver sent on 1/14/2023, answer due 4/14/2023. (Hnath, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Thu 12/22 7:31 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Clark Sebastian Bakewell for Hanshow America Inc.,Clark Sebastian Bakewell for Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/21/2022. (swil) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 12/13 10:39 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Clark S. Bakewell and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8706642. by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. (Hnath, Gary) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 12/12 2:08 PM
Summons Issued as to SES-imagotag GmbH. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/23 6:05 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. (Hnath, Gary) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 11/23 6:04 PM
Proposed Summons by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd.. (Hnath, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/23 6:03 PM
Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8677093.), filed by Hanshow America Inc., Hanshow Technology Co., Ltd..(Hnath, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 11/25 12:59 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (dvanm) |