Uku v. Capital One Bank (USA) NA.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Tolliver Giles |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01344 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2023 6:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Capital One Bank (USA) NA.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Uku
604 Monroe Street, #7
Hoboken, NJ 07030 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
So Ordered
Fri 10/06 8:02 AM
So Ordered re30 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 10/5/2023. (swil) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/05 3:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Capital One Bank (USA) NA.. (Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Thu 09/14 11:03 AM
Notice of Correction re28 Notice of Settlement. Unfortunately, the document contains more than one pleading or motion for relief. (As a reminder, we request that filing users file a copy of the same document separately for each pleading or motion relief.) For future reference, please file the motion again as a document. No further action is required at this time . (Dest) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 09/13 11:52 AM
ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint18 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE , it is further ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint7 is DENIED as moot ; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate28 is DENIED in all other respects. The parties are directed to file the Stipulation of Dismissal no later than October 4, 2023. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 9/13/2023. (tran) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Settlement (by Attorney)
Tue 09/12 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Richard Uku(Nwosu, Oti) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order ORDER TO VACATE MOTION HEARING AND DEADLINES | ||
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 08/21 3:09 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kez Ugbor Gabriel for Richard Uku. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 8/21/2023. (swil) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 08/14 10:09 AM
Notice of Correction: Unfortunately, the wrong event was used when filing the Pro Hac Vice application in re Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice. The clerk has contacted counsel by email to resolve the issue. (wgar, ) |
||
Saturday, August 12, 2023 | ||
misc
Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice
Sat 08/12 4:12 PM
Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice by Richard Uku. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9074479.. (Nwosu, Oti) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/25 11:57 AM
Set Deadline as to18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 801 before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (PER PTG CHAMBERS) (pmil, ) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply to Motion
Mon 05/08 3:21 PM
Reply to Motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA.. (Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 05/02 2:12 PM
ORDERED that Defendant's Motion (Dkt. 22) is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Opposition (Dkt. 21) is extended to and includes May 8, 2023 in re22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 5/2/2023. (show) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Waiver of
Mon 05/01 3:12 PM
Waiver of re22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Waiver of Hearing) by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. (Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 05/01 3:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Capital One Bank (USA) NA..(Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Motion
Thu 04/27 11:05 PM
Reply to Motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Richard Uku. (Nwosu, Oti) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Waiver of
Thu 04/13 3:00 PM
Waiver of re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Waiver of Hearing) by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. (Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
19 | 19
26
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 04/13 2:58 PM
Memorandum in Support re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA..(Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 04/13 2:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Capital One Bank (USA) NA.. (Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/23 11:20 AM
ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave is granted. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this order in re16 Amended Complaint, filed by Richard Uku. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/23/2023. (show) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/22 10:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND CONSENT AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Richard Uku.(Nwosu, Oti) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit UKU, CONSENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order UKU. CONSENT ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/22 10:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Richard Uku.(Nwosu, Oti) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/17 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Oti Winifred Nwosu on behalf of Richard Uku (Nwosu, Oti) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
respoth
Memorandum
Tue 03/14 3:57 PM
Plaintiff Richard Uku's Memorandum in Support to12 Amended Complaint. (show) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/14 3:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA) NA, filed by Richard Uku.(show) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 02/09 9:54 AM
ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension is granted. Plaintiff has until March 10, 2023 to file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss. No further extensions will beallowed in re10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 2/9/2023. (show) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 02/08 4:20 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro, filed by Richard Uku. (show) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Waiver of
Wed 01/18 3:23 PM
Waiver of re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Waiver of Hearing) by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. (Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
8 | 8
19
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 01/18 3:22 PM
Memorandum in Support re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA.. (Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 01/18 3:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Capital One Bank (USA) NA..(Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Roseboro Notice | ||
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 12/21 10:36 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERS that Capital One's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to and including January 18, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/21/2022. (show) (c/s pursuant to Order) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/20 6:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Abram Schaeffer on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA) NA. (Schaeffer, Seth) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/20 6:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA) NA.. (Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 12/20 6:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA) NA..(Lehnen, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/25 6:27 PM
Summons Issued to be served by special process server as to Capital One Bank (USA) NA. (Dest) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/25 6:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA) NA. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 14683097758.), filed by Richard Uku. (Dest) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt |