Hyatt v. Vidal
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael S Nachmanoff |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01348 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:145 Patent Non-Infringement- Patent Applicant is Dissatisfied with PTO Decision |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2023 5:12 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Katherine K. Vidal
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Gilbert P. Hyatt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katherine K. Vidal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gilbert P. Hyatt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 04/12 12:05 PM
ORDER granting10 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case by Gilbert P. Hyatt (see Order for further details).Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 4/12/2023. (nlop) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Fri 04/07 11:43 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case by Gilbert P. Hyatt.(DeLaquil, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 04/04 3:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gilbert P. Hyatt by Katherine K. Vidal.(Chan, Hugham) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/04 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Katherine K. Vidal (Chan, Hugham) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 02/27 2:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. Katherine K. Vidal served on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/17/2023.(DeLaquil, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service (U.S. Attorney General), | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service (U.S. Attorney for the EDVA) | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 11/30 1:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Katherine K. Vidal, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/30 12:48 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm) |
||
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 11/28 5:55 PM
NOTICE by Gilbert P. Hyatt (Proposed AO 120 Form) (DeLaquil, Mark) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 11/28 5:54 PM
Proposed Summons to the U.S. Attorney for the EDVA by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 11/28 5:53 PM
Proposed Summons to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 11/28 5:51 PM
Proposed Summons to the Attorney General of the United States by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/28 5:41 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8680373.), filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt.(DeLaquil, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |