Crum v. Walden Commons Corporate Office
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01333 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday May 20, 2023 7:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Walden Commons Corporate Office
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Hall Crum
121 P. Street Apt # 2
Washington, DC 20024 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Appeal Remark
Thu 07/20 2:46 PM
Letter to the Court from the USCA. Please transmit the record re22 Notice of Appeal. (swil) |
|
24 | 24
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 07/20 2:44 PM
USCA Case Number 23-1761 case manager Emily Borneisen 4th Circuit for22 Notice of Appeal filed by David Hall Crum. (swil) |
|
appeal
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA
Thu 07/20 2:50 PM
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re22 Notice of Appeal (swil) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
Tue 07/18 6:32 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re22 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov)(Fee Not Paid) (jlan) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/18 6:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to20 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,21 Clerk's Judgment by David Hall Crum.(jlan) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 06/14 7:45 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 58 in favor of the Defendant Walden Commons Corporate Office and against Plaintiff David Hall Crum. Entered by Clerk on 6/13/2023. (swil) |
|
20 | 20
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 06/14 7:39 AM
ORDERED that the Complaint [Dkt. No. 1] be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction in re12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/13/2023. (swil) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 04/14 6:01 PM
Plaintiff's Response in re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro, filed by David Hall Crum. (nlop) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/04 11:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walden Commons Corporate Office re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. AMENDED (Booth, Gwynne) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 04/05 11:27 AM
NOTICE an Addition to the Motion for a Legal Clarification in re15 MOTION to offer a Legal Clarification by David Hall Crum. (nlop) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B-B1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit D | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/03 4:10 PM
ORDER granting15 MOTION to offer a Legal Clarification. ORDERED that the defendant promptly send a copy of its Motion to Dismiss, accompanying attachments, and a proper Roseboro notice to plaintiff at 121 P. Street, S.W., Apt. 2, Washington, DC 20024, and, thereafter, file a certificate of service; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's time to respond to defendant's Motion to Dismiss be and is extended to 21 days after he receives the mailed copy. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/3/2023. (nlop) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Fri 03/31 5:26 PM
MOTION to offer a Legal Clarification in re13 ORDER by David Hall Crum. (nlop) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Waiver of
Fri 03/24 10:49 AM
Waiver of re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. by Walden Commons Corporate Office (Booth, Gwynne) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Thu 03/23 9:28 AM
Notice of Correction in re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (nlop) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/21 2:09 PM
ORDERED that the Clerk's entry of default be and is VACATED; and it is further ORDERED that the plaintiff file an opposition to defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Tuesday, April 11, 2023. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/21/2023. (nlop) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 03/21 11:02 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. by Walden Commons Corporate Office.(Booth, Gwynne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 03/14 4:22 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Walden Commons Corporate Office. (dvanm) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/14 9:26 AM
ORDERED that the Clerk enter a default against defendant Walden Commons Corporate Office. If defendant does not respond to the Complaint by March 21, 2023, this matter will be set for resolution on default judgment. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 03/14/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/23 3:49 PM
ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order defendant SHOW CAUSE why default should not be entered against it for failure to timely respond to the Summons and Complaint. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/23/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 01/25 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by David Hall Crum. (nlop) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/20 5:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Walden Commons Corporate Office served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023. (nlop) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/01 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Walden Commons Corporate Office. Service by USMS.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 USMS 285 Form | ||
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
order
Sealed Order
Mon 11/28 1:13 PM
Sealed ORDER granting motion for in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/28/2022. (dvanm) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/28/2022) (Dest, ) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt
Mon 11/28 9:36 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 11/28 9:32 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (dvanm) |
||
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 11/28 9:34 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Hall Crum. (dvanm) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 11/28 9:33 AM
Sealed Document - IDs with personal identifiers. (dvanm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/28 9:27 AM
COMPLAINT against Walden Commons Corporate Office, filed by David Hall Crum.(dvanm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |