Turpin v. Youngkin et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | M Hannah Lauck |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00735 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 18:1345 Injunctive and Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Jan 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 24, 2023 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Susan Beals
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sandra Brandt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Brink
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angela Chiang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Democratic Party of Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Georgia Alvis Long
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
L. Louise Lucas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donald Merricks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John O'Bannon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Susan Swecker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Glenn Youngkin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Turpin
4508 Willow Croft Drive
Virginia Beach, VA 23462 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
6
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/30 8:50 AM
FINAL ORDER Upon due consideration and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), the Court DISMISSES this matter, without prejudice.The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/30/2023. (Kat) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Motion
Tue 01/17 9:17 AM
Reply to Motion re17 MOTION Entry of an Order of Dismissal re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. and Memorandum in Support filed by Sandra Brandt, Democratic Party of Virginia, L. Louise Lucas, Susan Swecker. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 01/13 11:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION Entry of an Order of Dismissal re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. and Memorandum in Support filed by Cheryl Turpin. (Mayo, Evan) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/09 3:46 PM
ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Defendants L. Louise Lucas, Senate President Pro Tempore, in her official capacity; Democratic Party of Virginia; Susan Swecker, Chairwoman of the Democratic Party of Virginia, in her official capacity; and Sandra Brandts, Chairwoman of the Second Congressional District Democratic Committee, in her official capacity, Motion for Entry of Order of Dismissal on the Merits and with Prejudice and Memorandum in Support (the Motion). (ECF No. 17.) For purposes of reconsideration, the Court REOPENS the case. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff Cheryl Turpin to respond by no later than January 13, 2023. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 1/9/2023. (smej, ) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 01/06 2:32 PM
ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff Cheryl Turpin's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (the "Notice"). (ECF No. 16.) In the Notice, "[p]ursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(2), Plaintiff... Turpin hereby gives notice that this action is voluntarily dismissed," without prejudice. (ECF No. 16, at 1.) Having found good cause, pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(2), the Court hereby DISMISSES this matter. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 1/6/2023. (smej, ) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Fri 01/06 1:43 PM
MOTION Entry of an Order of Dismissal re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. and Memorandum in Support by Sandra Brandt, Democratic Party of Virginia, L. Louise Lucas, Susan Swecker. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/06 8:28 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cheryl Turpin (Mayo, Evan) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/06 8:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Davis Mayo on behalf of Cheryl Turpin (Mayo, Evan) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Reply Other
Fri 12/30 5:06 PM
Response to Memorandum Order13 by Paul Goldman. (adun, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/28 12:43 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER - The Court ORDERS Mr. Goldman to file a statement under oath about his ability to practice in this Court and why he should be allowed, under the rules, to assist Ms. Turpin in this case. Mr. Goldman SHALL file this statement no later than December 30, 2022. In addition, given that this case pertains to an election that will occur on January 10, 2023, the Court ORDERS that any response to Defendants Motions to Dismiss SHALL be filed no later than January 4, 2023. This deadline applies regardless of whether Ms. Turpin proceeds pro se or with counsel. The Court intends to rule on the papers no later than January 6, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 12/28/2022. (Copies mailed as overnight delivery to Ms. Turpin and to Mr. Goldman at the address included in ECF2 ) (smej, ) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 12/22 4:37 PM
Memorandum in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. filed by Susan Beals, Robert Brink, Angela Chiang, Georgia Alvis Long, Donald Merricks, John O'Bannon, Glenn Youngkin.(Ferguson, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan Beals | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 12/22 4:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. by Susan Beals, Robert Brink, Angela Chiang, Georgia Alvis Long, Donald Merricks, John O'Bannon, Glenn Youngkin. (Ferguson, Andrew) |
|
10 | 10
respoth
Brief in Support
Thu 12/22 3:48 PM
Brief in Support to9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Sandra Brandt, Democratic Party of Virginia, L. Louise Lucas, Susan Swecker.(Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 12/22 3:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Sandra Brandt, Democratic Party of Virginia, L. Louise Lucas, Susan Swecker. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/22 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Arnold Breit on behalf of Sandra Brandt, Democratic Party of Virginia, L. Louise Lucas, Susan Swecker (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/22 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Popps on behalf of Susan Beals, Robert Brink, Angela Chiang, Georgia Alvis Long, Donald Merricks, John O'Bannon, Glenn Youngkin (Popps, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/21 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew N. Ferguson on behalf of Susan Beals, Robert Brink, Angela Chiang, Georgia Alvis Long, Donald Merricks, John O'Bannon, Glenn Youngkin (Ferguson, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 12/07 3:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Susan Beals served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022; Sandra Brandt served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022; Robert Brink served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022; Angela Chiang served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022; Democratic Party of Virginia served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022; Georgia Alvis Long served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022; Donald Merricks served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022; John O'Bannon served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022; Susan Swecker served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022; Glenn Youngkin served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022. (smej, ) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Wed 12/07 3:07 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to L. Louise Lucas. (smej, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/30 4:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Susan Beals, Sandra Brandt, Robert Brink, Angela Chiang, Democratic Party of Virginia, Georgia Alvis Long, L. Louise Lucas, Donald Merricks, John O'Bannon, Susan Swecker, Glenn Youngkin. (Clerk contacted plaintiff's courier for pickup) (smej, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 11/30 11:02 AM
NOTICE - Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification by Cheryl Turpin re1 Petition for Declaratory Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction. (smej, ) |
|
Friday, November 25, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/28 11:31 AM
PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against Susan Beals, Sandra Brandt, Robert Brink, Angela Chiang, Democratic Party of Virginia, Georgia Alvis Long, L. Louise Lucas, Donald Merricks, John O'Bannon, Susan Swecker, Glenn Youngkin (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 34683055082), filed by Cheryl Turpin.(jjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt |