Denton v. Kijakazi
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | M Hannah Lauck |
Referred: | Summer L Speight |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00738 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 03/14 4:48 PM
ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on referral pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) for resolution of Plaintiff Bobbie D.'s Notice of Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (the "Motion"). (ECF Nos. 19, 253.) For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Plaintiff's Motion. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 3/14/2024. (smej, ) |
|
26 | 26
11
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Thu 03/14 4:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 3/14/2024. (smej, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/05 9:48 AM
ORDER Per the Standing Order signed by United States District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on September 8, 2023, the Court hereby ORDERS that this case be REASSIGNED to United States Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight for the purpose of adjudicating any award of attorneys fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 12/5/2023. (Kat) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 12/05 9:54 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight, per Order25 for the purpose of adjudicating any award of attorney's fees. Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell no longer assigned to the case. (Kat) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 07/17 7:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Bobbie Jo Denton.(Goss, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EAJA reply time | ||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Opposition
Mon 07/10 12:15 PM
Opposition to19 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Waiver of
Mon 06/26 1:29 PM
Waiver of re19 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Bobbie Jo Denton (Goss, John) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 06/26 1:28 PM
Memorandum in Support re19 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Bobbie Jo Denton. (Goss, John) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Mon 06/26 1:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re19 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Bobbie Jo Denton.(Goss, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- CPI Table, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- All Professional Time, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Attorney Time, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Paralegal Time, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees | ||
19 | 19
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 06/26 1:26 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Bobbie Jo Denton. (Goss, John) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/30 4:47 PM
ORDER that the Court having separately ordered the remand of this action for further administrative proceedings pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that final judgment of this Court is entered pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/30/2023. (jsmi, ) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Remand to Agency
Thu 03/30 4:45 PM
ORDER that Defendant's16 Consent Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Plaintiff's13 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's case is REMANDED to the Commissioner pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for additional evaluation. This case is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/30/2023. Copy to Plaintiff as directed. (jsmi, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Remand to Agency
Wed 03/29 11:18 AM
Consent MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration by Kilolo Kijakazi.(Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 03/08 7:49 AM
Notice of Correction re15 Waiver of Oral Argument. Document attached to filing is Memorandum in Support. Filing attorney advised to refile Waiver with correct attachment. (jsmi, ) |
||
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Waiver of
Mon 03/06 12:04 PM
Waiver of re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment Oral Argument by Bobbie Jo Denton (Goss, John) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 03/06 12:03 PM
Memorandum in Support re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bobbie Jo Denton. (Goss, John) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 03/06 12:02 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bobbie Jo Denton. (Goss, John) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Thu 02/02 1:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 2/2/2023. (adun, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/01 10:32 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Kilolo Kijakazi.(Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
utility
Administrative Record (Social Security Cases Only)
Wed 02/01 3:37 PM
SEALED Administrative Record Received. 1 box Placed on Clerk's office shelf. (adun, ) |
||
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/20 10:43 AM
STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 7/1/2022. (jsmi, ) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/20 10:42 AM
STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 7/1/2021. (jsmi, ) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/20 10:41 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 6/30/2021. (jsmi, ) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate Reporting Service
Mon 12/19 10:10 AM
Certificate Reporting Service by Kilolo Kijakazi. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 12/7/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/19 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Holland Hambrick on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Hambrick, Jonathan) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 12/01 9:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Placed in USM box for service of process. (jsmi, ) |
|
Att: 1 USM-285 forms | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 11/30 4:53 PM
ORDER that Plaintiffs2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Courts filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United State s Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 11/30/2022. (jsmi, ) |
|
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/30 9:26 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck and Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. (jsmi, ) |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 11/30 9:29 AM
Notice of Correction: Filing attorney advised that the civil case number was omitted from the Complaint and Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk has added the case number and no further action is required. (jsmi, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/29 3:45 PM
Proposed Summons by Bobbie Jo Denton.(Goss, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 USM-285 Forms, | ||
Att: 4 USM-285 Forms, | ||
Att: 5 USM-285 Forms | ||
2 | 2
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Tue 11/29 3:43 PM
MOTION To proceed in forma pauperis by Bobbie Jo Denton. (Goss, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/29 3:42 PM
Complaint , filed by Bobbie Jo Denton.(Goss, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |