Palen v. Kendall
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Tolliver Giles |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01352 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday May 28, 2023 5:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Frank Kendall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph C Palen
20079 Stone Oak Parkway Suite 1105-506
San Antonio, TX 78258 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 08/21 11:29 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the order of this Court entered on 08/21/2023 and in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 58, JUDGMENT is hereby entered that Plaintiff, Joseph C. Palen, is awarded Two Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents ($2,000.00) in attorneys fees. Entered by the Clerk on 08/21/2023. (jlan) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/21 10:27 AM
ORDERED that Plaintiff, Joseph C. Palen, is awarded Two Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents ($2,000.00) in attorneys fees. The Two Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents ($2,000.00) in attorneys fees will be paid, as promptly as practicable, consistent with the Defendant's normal processing procedures, after Plaintiff provides the necessary information for the funds transfer to be carried out. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 08/21/2023. (jlan) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/24 1:33 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiff's Entitlement to Attorney's Fees by Frank Kendall.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/11 12:38 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED and the above captioned case is DISMISSED with prejudice in re13 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 4/11/2023. (Dest) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss Voluntarily
Mon 04/03 2:34 PM
MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Joseph C Palen.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/01 10:09 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Frank Kendall.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/20 2:57 PM
STATUS REPORT by Frank Kendall.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/13 1:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Frank Kendall.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 12/22 1:15 PM
ORDERED that the Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time (Dkt. 6) is GRANTED. The defendant shall file its Answer to the Complaint on or before January 13, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 12/22/2022. (nneb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 12/22 1:21 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (jlan) |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Waiver of
Wed 12/21 11:29 AM
Waiver of re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, of Hearing by Frank Kendall (Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 12/21 11:16 AM
Notice of Correction re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re (1) Complaint,, . Notice of Correction re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint . Unfortunately, the motion was filed without a Notice of Hearing Date that sets the motion for a Friday docket. The filer user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date, or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (Dest) |
||
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/20 6:41 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, filed by Joseph C Palen. (Pristera, Brian) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 12/16 3:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by Frank Kendall.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 12/05 7:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph C Palen. Frank Kendall served on 12/5/2022, answer due 2/3/2023.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 11/30 10:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Frank Kendall, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(nneb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/29 4:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Civil Cover Sheet against Frank Kendall, filed by Joseph C Palen.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/29 4:23 PM
Proposed Summons by Joseph C Palen.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Propose Summons USA EDVA, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Propose Summons USAG | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/29 4:16 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8683121.), filed by Joseph C Palen.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit N | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/30 10:43 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (nneb) |