Palen v. Austin
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Tolliver Giles |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01359 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday May 28, 2023 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lloyd J. Austin, III
Office of the Secretary of Defense 1000 Defense Pentagon
Washington, DC 20301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph C Palen
20079 Stone Oak Parkway Suite 1105-506
San Antonio, TX 78258 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 08/21 11:07 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 58 in favor of the Plaintiff Joseph C Palen and against Defendant Lloyd J. Austin, III in the amount of Two Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents ($2,000.00) in attorney's fees. Entered by Clerk on 8/21/2023. (swil) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/21 10:40 AM
ORDERED that Plaintiff, Joseph C. Palen, is awarded Two Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents ($2,000.00) in attorney's fees. The Two Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents ($2,000.00) in attorney's fees will be paid, as promptly as practicable, consistent with the Defendants normal processing procedures, after Plaintiff provides the necessary information for the funds transfer to be carried out in re16 Stipulation Regarding Plaintiff's Entitlement to Attorney's Fees filed by Lloyd J. Austin, III (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 8/21/2023. (swil) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/26 9:49 AM
STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiff's Entitlement to Attorney's Fees by Lloyd J. Austin, III.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
So Ordered
Mon 05/01 11:52 AM
So Ordered in re14 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 5/1/2023. (Dest) |
|
Sunday, April 30, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Voluntarily
Sun 04/30 11:27 AM
MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Joseph C Palen.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/03 9:34 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Lloyd J. Austin, III.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/01 10:05 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Lloyd J. Austin, III.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/20 3:02 PM
STATUS REPORT by Lloyd J. Austin, III.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/13 1:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Lloyd J. Austin, III.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 12/22 1:13 PM
ORDERED that the Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time (Dkt. 6) is GRANTED. The defendant shall file its Answer to the Complaint on or before January 13, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 12/22/2022. (nneb) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Waiver of
Wed 12/21 11:25 AM
Waiver of re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint of Hearing by Lloyd J. Austin, III (Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 12/21 11:14 AM
Notice of Correction re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re (1) Complaint . Notice of Correction re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint . Unfortunately, the motion was filed without a Notice of Hearing Date that sets the motion for a Friday docket. The filer user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date, or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (Dest) |
||
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/20 6:43 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by Joseph C Palen. (Pristera, Brian) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 12/16 3:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Lloyd J. Austin, III.(Fuchs, Yuri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 12/05 7:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph C Palen. Lloyd J. Austin, III served on 12/5/2022, answer due 2/3/2023.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 11/30 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Lloyd J. Austin, III, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(swil) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Notice | ||
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/29 5:35 PM
Proposed Summons by Joseph C Palen.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
2 | 2
trial
Exhibit
Tue 11/29 5:34 PM
EXHIBIT A by Joseph C Palen..(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit H | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/29 5:30 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8683759.), filed by Joseph C Palen.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/30 12:33 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (swil) |