Elliott v. Commonwealth of Virginia/ Chesapeake Circuit Court
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry E Hudson |
Referred: | Mark R Colombell |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00743 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 02/09 9:33 AM
ORDER (Denying Request to Remove State Criminal Prosecution)- In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's request to remove his state court criminal prosecution to this Court1 is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this action on the docket. No further action will be taken by this Court. Any appeal from this decision must be taken by filing a written notice of appeal with the Clerk of the Court within 30 days of the date of entry hereof. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/9/2023. Copy of Opinion and Order mailed to the Plaintiff and Chesapeake Circuit Court. (adun, ) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Thu 02/09 9:28 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/9/2023. (adun, ) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Fri 12/02 3:06 PM
MOTION of Notice of Appeal for Bond by Anthony W. Elliott.(adun, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 11/30 1:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony W. Elliott. (adun, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Prisoner (1983)
Wed 11/30 1:18 PM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Virginia/ Chesapeake Circuit Court, filed by Anthony W. Elliott.(adun, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |