Feistner v. Transunion, LLC
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | P K Holmes III |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02182 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 4:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
Transunion, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Johnathan Feistner
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 03/01/2023
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 03/24/2023
|
|
Defendant
Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Terminated: 03/03/2023
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Clerk's Order Dismissing Case/Party
Wed 04/05 9:15 AM
CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL: re25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by Johnathan Feistner. CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (mjm) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Party/Case)
Tue 04/04 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Johnathan Feistner . (Newark, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Clerk's Order Dismissing Case/Party
Fri 03/24 11:23 AM
CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL: re23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party filed by Johnathan Feistner. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (mjm) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Party/Case)
Fri 03/24 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., by Johnathan Feistner . (Newark, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Clerk's Order Dismissing Case/Party
Fri 03/03 10:58 AM
CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL: re21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party filed by Johnathan Feistner. Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (mjm) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Party/Case)
Fri 03/03 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party, Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, by Johnathan Feistner . (Newark, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Clerk's Order Dismissing Case/Party
Wed 03/01 2:00 PM
CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL: re19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party filed by Johnathan Feistner. Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (mjm) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Party/Case)
Wed 03/01 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party, Equifax Information Services, LLC, by Johnathan Feistner . (Newark, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Party/Case)
Wed 02/22 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party, Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, by Johnathan Feistner . (Newark, Robert) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 02/17 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Johnathan Feistner (Newark, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 02/15 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant TransUnion, LLC by Johnathan Feistner (Newark, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 02/09 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC by Johnathan Feistner (Newark, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Default
Wed 02/08 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROCEDURE under FRCP 55 directed to plaintiff as to default of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC. Affidavit in Support of Default due by 2/22/2023.(mjm) |
|
Att: 1 Affidiavt in Support of Default | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Wed 02/08 9:20 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due on or before 3/9/2023. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 8, 2023. (mc) |
||
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney
Mon 02/06 4:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Scott, Ralph) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 02/06 4:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint, Unopposed Motion To Extend Time For Equifax Information Services LLC To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Scott, Ralph) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/06 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph Downing Scott, III on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Scott, Ralph) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 01/03 4:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Johnathan Feistner. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC was sent waiver on 12/20/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. (Newark, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 01/03 4:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Johnathan Feistner. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. was sent waiver on 12/8/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Newark, Robert) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 12/12 12:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Johnathan Feistner. Equifax Information Services, LLC was sent waiver on 12/9/2022, answer due 2/7/2023. (Newark, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 12/12 11:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Johnathan Feistner. Transunion, LLC was sent waiver on 12/9/2022, answer due 2/7/2023. (Newark, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/30 11:30 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, Transunion, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Requested
Wed 11/30 11:16 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, TransUnion, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Equifax Information Services, LLC for service of the following document: 2 Complaint,.(Newark, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
3 | 3
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Wed 11/30 11:11 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/30 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, Transunion, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2694371), filed by Johnathan Feistner.(Newark, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 11/30 10:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Johnathan Feistner. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (mjm) |