Lambel v. Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Case #: | 6:22-cv-06123 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 4:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC
2001 Jeannin Drive
North Port, FL 34288 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Lambel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Final Scheduling Order
Wed 09/27 3:12 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for the week of 6/3/2024 @ 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 27, 2023. (rwg) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Wed 07/19 9:29 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Teresa Lambel. (Whaley, Stewart) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Wed 06/21 2:33 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 7/19/2023. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 7/26/2023. Bench Trial set for 6/3/2024 in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 21, 2023. (rwg) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/05 3:12 PM
NOTICE by Teresa Lambel Consent to Join - Jason Lambel (Whaley, Stewart) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Strike
Mon 05/15 10:31 AM
ORDER denying as moot12 MOTION to Strike11 Answer to Complaint. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 15, 2023. (tmc) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 05/09 1:44 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re12 MOTION to Strike11 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer filed by Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC. (Owens, Danielle) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney
Tue 05/09 1:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC. (Owens, Danielle) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint)
Mon 05/08 4:44 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint AMENDED ANSWER by Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC.(Owens, Danielle) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/08 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Owens on behalf of Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC. (Owens, Danielle) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/08 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan H. Potts on behalf of Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC. (Potts, Dylan) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Strike
Wed 04/26 3:31 PM
MOTION to Strike11 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer by Teresa Lambel. (Whaley, Stewart) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint)
Thu 04/20 10:59 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC.(tmc) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/21 10:57 AM
WARNING ORDER as to Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC, re9 Order on Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE, granting7 MOTION to Extend Time to Achieve Service of Process (jlm) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Service
Mon 03/20 3:00 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC. See Order for Specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 20, 2023. (tmc) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 03/20 12:58 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Extend. However, the Court will extend the time to serve Plaintiff by only ninety days. Plaintiff has up to and including 6/28/2023 to serve Defendant. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 20, 2023. (tmc) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend
Wed 03/15 1:35 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Achieve Service of Process by Teresa Lambel.(Whaley, Stewart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Granting Motion | ||
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Service
Thu 02/02 11:21 AM
MOTION for Service Motion for Authority to Serve via Warning Order by Teresa Lambel.(Whaley, Stewart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Whaley Decl., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavt of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Returned Mail, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Warning Order | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/30 11:50 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Wed 11/30 11:48 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Wed 11/30 11:02 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Carib's Cable and Fiber LLC for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Whaley, Stewart) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/30 11:01 AM
COMPLAINT against Carib's Cable and Fiber, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2694369), filed by Teresa Lambel.(Whaley, Stewart) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 11/30 10:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Teresa Lambel. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (mjm) |