Unique Communications Solutions v. Tyto Athene, LLC
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Tolliver Giles |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01364 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 6:51 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Tyto Athene, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Unique Communications Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyto Athene, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Unique Communications Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
So Ordered
Mon 05/01 1:15 PM
So Ordered in re18 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 5/1/2023. (show) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 04/27 11:53 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Unique Communications Solutions. (Bunting-Eubanks, Lindsay) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 04/19 9:00 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick: Settlement Conference held on 4/18/2023. Appearances of counsel. Case settled. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 04/05 8:30 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
5
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Fri 03/17 8:36 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Proposed Joint Discovery Plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (Joint Discovery Plan) (Dkt. 16) and at the initial pretrial conference held on March 15, 2023 and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Dkt. 15), the court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by June 16, 2023. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved, as amended herein, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. 3. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by March 9, 2023. 4. Expert disclosures shall be governed by paragraph 3(b) of the Joint Discovery Plan. To the extent the parties wish to modify these deadlines, they must seek leave of court. 5. If the parties believe that a settlement conference with the court would be of assistance in resolving this dispute, they may arrange a settlement conference by contacting the undersigned magistrate judges chambers. (see Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 3/16/23. (tfitz, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 03/17 8:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick:Initial Pretrial Conference held via phone on 3/15/2023. Appearances of counsel. Joint Discovery Plan adopted. Order to follow.(per WEF chambers) (tfitz, ) |
||
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
5
pgs
misc
Discovery Plan
Wed 03/08 2:49 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Discovery Plan by Unique Communications Solutions.(Bunting-Eubanks, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 02/09 4:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. Discovery due by 6/16/2023. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 02/09/23.(pmil, ) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 02/09 2:39 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim re11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Unique Communications Solutions. (Bunting-Eubanks, Lindsay) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/19 9:22 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Tyto Athene, LLC. (McGraw, Diana Lyn) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Thu 01/19 9:22 AM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Tyto Athene, LLC. (McGraw, Diana Lyn) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 01/19 9:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses , and COUNTERCLAIM and against Unique Communications Solutions by Tyto Athene, LLC.(McGraw, Diana Lyn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit PO-3833, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit PO-5394, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Flow Down Requirements | ||
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 01/06 9:12 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Defendant's answer, motion, or otherwise responsive pleading is due January 19, 2023 (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 1/5/2023. (show) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of
Wed 01/04 5:26 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Tyto Athene, LLC.(McGraw, Diana Lyn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 01/03 12:18 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Matthew Lewis Durham for Unique Communications Solutions. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 1/3/2023. (swil) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 12/22 1:14 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Lewis Durham and Certification of Local Counsel Lindsay K. Bunting Eubanks Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8722023. by Unique Communications Solutions.(Bunting-Eubanks, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/22 12:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unique Communications Solutions Tyto Athene, LLC served on 12/15/2022, answer due 1/5/2023 (Bunting-Eubanks, Lindsay) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/01 12:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Tyto Athene, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Dest) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/30 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Biondi on behalf of Unique Communications Solutions (Biondi, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 11/30 3:45 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Unique Communications Solutions. (Bunting-Eubanks, Lindsay) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/30 3:28 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Unique Communications Solutions. (Bunting-Eubanks, Lindsay) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/30 3:22 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8685941.), filed by Unique Communications Solutions.(Bunting-Eubanks, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 12/01 12:36 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (show) |