Vogts v Genie Jar Marketing, LLC
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jamar K Walker |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00124 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 5:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
Genie Jar Marketing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Vogts
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 06/28 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brandon Vogts (Schleifman, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Settlement (by Attorney)
Tue 05/02 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Genie Jar Marketing, LLC (Burch, Kristan) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 04/28 12:29 PM
Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 5/5/2023 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk Remote before District Judge Jamar K. Walker. (ptom, ) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order
Wed 03/29 9:38 AM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk Remote. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 3/28/23 & filed on 3/29/23. (ptom, ) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/17 11:06 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen no longer assigned to the case. (afar) |
||
Thursday, December 29, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/29 8:14 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Genie Jar Marketing, LLC. (Burch, Kristan) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/29 8:13 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Genie Jar Marketing, LLC.(Burch, Kristan) |
|
misc
Refer for 16 b
Thu 12/29 10:45 AM
Refer for 16(b) (afar) |
||
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/22 5:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Vogts All Defendants (Schleifman, Paul) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 12/15 10:34 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dustin H. Hevore, Registered Agent on 12/8/2022, filed by Brandon Vogts. (Schleifman, Paul) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Thu 12/15 3:36 PM
Notice of Correction re5 Affidavit of Service: The incorrect event was used and the Original Summons was not returned. As noted in docket entry at ECF3 the correct event that should have been used was "Summons Returned Executed." No further action is required at this time. (afar) |
||
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Report Regarding Copyright
Fri 12/02 12:50 PM
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a copyright. (dbra, ) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/01 4:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Genie Jar Marketing, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 12/01 2:01 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Brandon Vogts. (Schleifman, Paul) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Thu 12/01 1:51 PM
Notice of Correction re [1-4], Summons and [1-5], Report on filing. Neither of these documents should have been attached to the initiating document and have been removed. Please refile the Summons using the Proposed Summons event and the Report using the Report Regarding Patent and Trademark.(epri, ) |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/30 3:14 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8685732.) , filed by Brandon Vogts.(Schleifman, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Rpt on filing, | ||
Att: 6 Cert of Interested Persons | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 12/01 1:43 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) |