Vigil v. Southside Regional Jail Prison Officals
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | M Hannah Lauck |
Referred: | Mark R Colombell |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00740 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 03/25 4:31 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Travis Benjamin Vigil. Clerk checked VA DOC Locator and re-mailed ECF43 . (jenjones, ) |
|
46 | 46
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 03/25 4:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re38 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Roseboro,. filed by Mrs. Morefield. (Breit-Rupe, Sean) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 03/21 1:16 PM
PLRA Filing fee: $ 10.00, receipt number 300003772 (Lgar, ) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/19 9:53 AM
Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Unmarked exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 03/12 3:02 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Court construes Plaintiff to ask for an extension of time to file a response to the Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs request for an extension (ECF No.42 ) is GRANTED to the extent that he must file his response within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS (Copy mailed to plaintiff as directed) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 3/12/24. (mful, ) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Extension of
Tue 03/05 9:59 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Travis Benjamin Vigil.(jpow, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 02/28 4:30 PM
PLRA Filing fee: $ 13.00, receipt number 300003605 (Lgar, ) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Thu 02/22 8:41 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mrs. Morefield. (Breit-Rupe, Sean) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
12
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 02/19 10:46 PM
Memorandum in Support re38 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Roseboro,. filed by Mrs. Morefield.(Breit-Rupe, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 02/19 10:11 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Roseboro,. by Mrs. Morefield.(Breit-Rupe, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 02/08 3:42 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Travis Benjamin Vigil.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 01/04 9:00 AM
PLRA Filing fee: $40.00, receipt number 300003121. (adun, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 12/27 12:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Benjamin Vigil. Mrs. Morefield served on 11/22/2023, answer due 12/13/2023. (jenjones, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/20 4:18 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff, a Virginia inmate proceeding pro se and in forma pauperis , brings this action. Any party wishing to file a motion for summary judgment must do so within sixty (60) days of the date of entry hereof. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 12/20/2023. Copy of this Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff.(jenjones, ) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/18 8:17 PM
ANSWER to22 Complaint by Mrs. Morefield.(Breit-Rupe, Sean) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/18 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Woodul Tunner on behalf of Mrs. Morefield (Tunner, William) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/18 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Willer Adams on behalf of Mrs. Morefield (Adams, Rachel) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/18 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Breit-Rupe on behalf of Mrs. Morefield (Breit-Rupe, Sean) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 11/21 1:27 PM
PLRA Filing fee: $ 18.00, receipt number 100004701. (jenjones, ) |
|
28 | 28
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/20 2:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Mrs. Morefield. Placed in USM box for service of process. (jenjones, ) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 11/20 2:18 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Denying Motion and Directing Service on Defendant) that the request for the Marshal's assistance26 is DENIED. Nevertheless, Plaintiff indicates that he believes Defendant may still work at the Southside Regional Jail and provides an address, albeit missing the street number. The Court will issue process for Defendant at the address for the jail. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process for Defendant, at Southside Regional Jail,244 Uriah Branch Way, Emporia, VA 23847. 2. The Marshal is DIRECTED to serve Defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e) and file his return within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof. Service shall include a copy of this Memorandum Order and the Particularized Complaint (ECF No.22 ). The Marshal shall send a copy of the USM 285 Form to Plaintiff. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 11/20/2023. Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff. (jenjones, ) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Tue 11/14 10:34 AM
LETTER MOTION for Assistance of Marshall to help with the street address of Mrs. Morefield by Travis Benjamin Vigil.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 10/18 3:35 PM
PLRA Filing fee: $ 10.00, receipt number 300002572. (jenjones, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 10/04 3:50 PM
PLRA Filing fee: $ 65.81, receipt number 300002462 (Lgar, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/27 4:01 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER that: Plaintiff has ninety (90) days from the date of entry hereof to serve Defendant Morefield. If Plaintiff wishes the assistance of the Marshal in serving Defendant, he should promptly provide the Court with street addresses where Defendant can be served. Upon the provision of such addresses, the Clerk will issue process and the Marshal will attempt to serve Defendant. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 9/27/2023. Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff as directed. (jenjones, ) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/18 4:30 PM
PARTICULARIZED COMPLAINT against Southside Regional Jail Prison Officials filed by Travis Benjamin Vigil.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 08/25 4:25 PM
PLRA Filing fee: $27.00, receipt number 300002140 (adun, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 08/22 4:51 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Granting Extension of Time). That by Memorandum Order entered on July 18, 2023, the Court directed Plaintiff to file a particularized complaint17 . On August 21, 2023, the Court received a letter asking for an unspecified extension of time to comply with the July 18, 2023 Memorandum Order19 . The request for an extension of time19 is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff shall file his particularized complaint within 30 days of the date of entry hereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 8/22/2023. Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff. (jenjones, ) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of
Mon 08/21 4:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Travis Benjamin Vigil.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 08/10 2:03 PM
PLRA Filing fee: $ 6.00, receipt number 300001988 (jenjones, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/18 4:55 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Directing Plaintiff to File a Particularized Complaint) - Accordingly, Plaintiff is DIRECTED, within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof, to particularize his complaint in conformance with the following directions and in the order set forth in this Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 7/18/2023. Copy mailed to Plaintiff(jenjones, ) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/18 4:02 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Filing and Screening Action upon Inmates Payment of the Initial Partial Filing Fee) It is ORDERED that: The action is FILED and Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The action will now be screen in conformity with 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2). The institution where Plaintiff is confined will mail twenty percent (20%) of all of Plaintiff's deposits to the Court until the balance of $335.35 is paid. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 5/18/23. Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff and his place of incarceration. Consent to Collection of Fees form also mailed to the institution.(jenjones, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 05/09 1:42 PM
PLRA Filing fee: $ 14.65, receipt number 300001274 (jenjones, ) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/31 4:22 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Assessing Initial Partial Filing Fee) Within 30 days of the date of entry hereof, Plaintiff must submit an initial partial filing fee of $14.65 or state under penalty of perjury that he does not have sufficient assets to pay such a fee. Plaintiff remains liable for the entire filing fee of $350.00. The institution will then forward to the Court 20% of all deposits into Plaintiffs account until the full $350.00 filing fee is paid. If Plaintiff persists in prosecuting the action or fails to voluntarily dismiss the action within 30 days of the date of entry hereof, he will be responsible for paying the entire filing fee. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 3/31/2023. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff. (adun, ) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Collection of Fees
Thu 03/16 3:32 PM
Consent to Collection of Fees received from Travis Vigil.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
12 | 12
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 3:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis Benjamin Vigil.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 02/23 2:30 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Travis Benjamin Vigil. (smej, ) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 02/16 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Travis Benjamin Vigil to St. Brides Correctional Center. (smej, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/07 11:44 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER - It is ORDERED that: this action remains CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6-month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 2/7/2023. (Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff with IFP Form and Consent to Collection of Fees. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.) (smej, ) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Response Other
Thu 01/19 4:15 PM
Response in re3 : Memorandum Order as to Travis Benjamin Vigil. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(jjones, ) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Fri 12/30 2:23 PM
Letter from Travis Vigil.(jjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Clerk's Response | ||
Friday, December 23, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 12/23 2:20 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Travis Benjamin Vigil (jjones, ) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 12/22 4:39 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Travis Benjamin Vigil. (adun, ) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 12/15 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Travis Benjamin Vigil(jjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/13 3:02 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER. It is ORDERED that: this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6-month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 12/13/2022. (Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff with IFP Form and Consent to Collection of Fees. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.)(jjones, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 11/30 2:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis Benjamin Vigil. (jjones, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Prisoner (1983)
Wed 11/30 2:47 PM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against Southside Regional Jail, filed by Travis Benjamin Vigil.(jjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
misc
Consent/Decline to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/09 9:26 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Travis Benjamin Vigil. (jpow, ) |