Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC vs. Derrico, et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Trenga |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01365 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(b) - Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 5:31 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Active Security Consulting, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Jack Derrico
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jack Derrico
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Active Security Consulting, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Timothy Demarest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
order
So Ordered
Fri 02/03 9:48 AM
So Ordered re33 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 02/03/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 02/02 6:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC. (Glajch, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/19 8:07 AM
Set Deadline as to22 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (wgar, ) |
||
minutes
Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 01/20 10:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala: Settlement Conference held on 1/19/2023. Settlement Conference lasted for 8 hours and 15 minutes. Case settled. Dismissal notices to be filed within 14 days. Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 2/8/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (nneb) |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Wed 01/18 6:54 PM
Notice of Hearing Date March 1, 2023 re23 Memorandum in Support,22 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hansen, Peter) |
|
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/18 5:18 PM
ORDER granting Electronic Device Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 01/18/23. (pmil, ) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Electronic Device Application
Fri 01/13 1:51 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Electronic Device Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 1/13/2023. (swil) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Electronic Device Application
Fri 01/13 1:21 PM
MOTION for Electronic Device Application by Active Security Consulting, LLC. (Lienhard, Jonathan) |
|
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/13 12:19 PM
ORDER granting Electronic Device Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 1/13/2023. (nneb) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/06 6:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Hansen on behalf of Jack Derrico (Hansen, Peter) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/06 6:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Hansen on behalf of Timothy Demarest (Hansen, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/03 1:53 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Active Security Consulting, LLC. (Gordon, Phillip) |
|
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/03 8:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 5/12/2023. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/3/2023.(dzir) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Tue 01/03 11:27 AM
Notice of Correction re22 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 01/04 8:53 AM
Settlement Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (nneb) |
||
Monday, January 02, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 01/02 4:41 PM
Memorandum in Support re22 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy Demarest. (Hansen, Peter) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 01/02 4:40 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Timothy Demarest. (Hansen, Peter) |
|
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 01/02 4:17 PM
Jack Derrico ANSWER to Complaint Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC , Jack Derrico COUNTERCLAIM Jack Derrico against Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC by Jack Derrico.(Hansen, Peter) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/02 2:33 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Jack Derrico. (Hansen, Peter) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/02 2:32 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Timothy Demarest. (Hansen, Peter) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 12/30 1:13 PM
Active Security Consulting, LLC ANSWER to Complaint Securadyne Systems Intermediate, LLC , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Active Security Consulting, LLC.(Gordon, Phillip) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Tue 12/20 3:49 PM
ORDERED that the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, be, and the same hereby is, DENIED; it is further ORDERED that the Parties are to proceed in front of Magistrate Judge Lindsey Vaala, as directed by the Court. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 12/20/2022. (dzir) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 12/19 3:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2022 re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant. Motion argued and denied. Parties directed to schedule a settlement conference and discuss expedited discovery with Magistrate Judge Vaala. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Opposition
Fri 12/16 4:20 PM
Opposition to3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Active Security Consulting, LLC. (Gordon, Phillip) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/14 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Bryan Pardue on behalf of Active Security Consulting, LLC (Pardue, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/13 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Philip Lienhard on behalf of Active Security Consulting, LLC (Lienhard, Jonathan) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/13 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Michael Gordon on behalf of Active Security Consulting, LLC (Gordon, Phillip) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Mon 12/12 12:28 PM
ORDERED that the hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order3 is to be continued to Monday, December 19, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 12/12/2022. Motion Hearing reset for 12/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga.(dzir) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2022 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/08 10:48 AM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (dvanm) |
||
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 12/07 3:10 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Lindsay McCall for Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/7/2022. (nneb) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 12/07 3:06 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Matthew Crawford for Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/7/2022. (nneb) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/07 2:07 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsay McCall and Certification of Local Counsel Jessica Glajch Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8698575. by Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC. (Glajch, Jessica) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/07 2:06 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Crawford and Certification of Local Counsel Jessica Glajch Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8698566. by Securadyne Systems Intermediate LLC. (Glajch, Jessica) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Wed 12/07 2:03 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for 12/14/2022 re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Notice of Correction (Glajch, Jessica) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 12/05 11:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Active Security Consulting, LLC, Timothy Demarest, Jack Derrico. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 12/05 10:54 AM
Notice of Correction re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm) |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
19
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 11/30 4:37 PM
Memorandum in Support re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by SECURADYNE SYSTEMS INTERMEDIATE LLC d/b/a ALLIED UNIVERSAL TECHNOLOGY SERVICES. (Glajch, Jessica) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 11/30 4:36 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by SECURADYNE SYSTEMS INTERMEDIATE LLC d/b/a ALLIED UNIVERSAL TECHNOLOGY SERVICES.(Glajch, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 11/30 4:34 PM
Proposed Summons by SECURADYNE SYSTEMS INTERMEDIATE LLC d/b/a ALLIED UNIVERSAL TECHNOLOGY SERVICES. (Glajch, Jessica) |
|
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/30 4:30 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8686386.), filed by SECURADYNE SYSTEMS INTERMEDIATE LLC d/b/a ALLIED UNIVERSAL TECHNOLOGY SERVICES.(Glajch, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 12/05 10:49 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (dvanm) |