Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:22-cv-00964
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2022
Terminated:Oct 30, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 4:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Oak Plains Academy
Represented By
Mary Dohner Smith
Constangy, Brooks, Smith, & Prophete, LLP
contact info
Teresa Rider Bult
Constangy Brooks Smith And Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Rachael Rustmann
Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete
contact info
Plaintiff
Andjelka M. Ivasic
5022 Bunker Lane
Smyrna, TN 37167


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, October 30, 2023
20 20 misc Entry of Judgment Mon 10/30 10:17 AM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:19 Order Dismissing Case, (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (af)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10/30 10:16 AM
ORDER: The Court acknowledges that this action has been DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE effective as of the time of the filing of the Stipulation, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter final judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 and close the file. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/30/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/24 8:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Oak Plains Academy. (Smith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Mon 05/15 12:00 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, Oak Plains Academy's motion to strike (Doc. No.13 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to strike Ivasic's response (Doc. No. 12 ) from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 05/15/23. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/11 9:18 AM
Authorization to Release Protected Healthcare Information General Medical Information by Andjelka M. Ivasic (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/22 9:00 AM
RESPONSE to the Court and Opposition to Oak Plains Academy on Defendant's13 MOTION filed by Andjelka M. Ivasic. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
14 14 5 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 03/09 2:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of13 MOTION to Strike12 Reply Strike Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Answer filed by Oak Plains Academy . (Smith, Mary)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Strike Thu 03/09 2:53 PM
MOTION to Strike12 Reply Strike Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Answer by Oak Plains Academy. (Smith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
12 12 respoth Reply Fri 02/24 1:53 PM
Response to Defendant and Teresa Rider Bult, Attorney for Defendant filed by Andjelka M. Ivasic re6 Answer to Complaint filed by Oak Plains Academy. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 02/16 11:09 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Dohner Smith admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 02/16 11:11 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Rachael Rustmann admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/15 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Rustmann on behalf of Oak Plains Academy (Rustmann, Rachael)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/15 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Dohner Smith on behalf of Oak Plains Academy (Smith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
9 9 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 01/03 4:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2023. Discovery due by 7/3/2023. Discovery Motions due by 7/3/23. Dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 01/03/23. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/30 11:17 AM
NOTICE to court regarding unexecuted summons returned by Andjelka M. Ivasic (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
7 7 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Wed 12/28 2:13 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oak Plains Academy.(Bult, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Service
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/28 1:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Oak Plains Academy.(Bult, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
5 5 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 12/05 4:12 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. §§ 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72 and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/05/22. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 11/30 2:57 PM
Summons issued as to Oak Plains Academy. (Summons handed back to Plaintiff for service. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 11/30 2:48 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Wed 11/30 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/30 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Oak Plains Academy (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 34675067761), filed by Andjelka M. Ivasic.(ad) (ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit - EEOC Letter
Att: 3 (11/30/2022) Attachment - Receipt
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included. (ad) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/30 3:03 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included. (ad)
Related: [-]