Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Case #: 6:22-cv-06124
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 14, 2023 3:42 AM CST
Defendant
Gary White
Represented By
Jeffrey C Elliott
Elliott Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos R. Rangel
Represented By
Megan Henry
Lacy Law Firm
contact info
Brandon W. Lacy
Lacy Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/30/2023 11:59 PM CST
Friday, January 20, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/20 3:21 PM
NOTICE by Gary White (Elliott, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 01/17 11:05 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Gary White. (Elliott, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
9 9 order Initial Scheduling Order Tue 01/10 4:20 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 2/3/2023. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 2/10/2023. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2024 in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 10, 2023. (rwg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) Thu 12/15 1:59 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Gary White.(Elliott, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/05 5:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Carlos R. Rangel. Gary White served on 12/3/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Lacy, Brandon)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/05 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Henry on behalf of Carlos R. Rangel. (Henry, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
notice Clerk's Notice re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading Thu 12/01 8:00 AM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Carlos R. Rangel. Complaint2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Megan A. Henry . (hnc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 11/30 4:18 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Gary White and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Wed 11/30 4:17 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Requested Wed 11/30 3:57 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Carl White for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 11/30 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Gary White ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2694810), filed by Carlos R. Rangel.(Lacy, Brandon)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/30 3:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Carlos R. Rangel. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (jlm)
Related: [-]