Olohan v. Google LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Arun Subramanian |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-10163 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332ed Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 4:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Google LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tiffany Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Olohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
139 | 139
order
Memo Endorsement
Wed 07/24 4:53 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:138 Letter filed by Tiffany Miller. ENDORSEMENT: While the Court understands Ms. Miller's concern, the Court does not believe that continued litigation is warranted when Mr. Olohan seeks dismissal with prejudice. See Brown v. Brown, 343 F. Supp. 2d 195, 199 (E.D.N.Y. 2004) (dismissing case with prejudice at plaintiff's request despite defendant's objection); see also Smoot v. Fox, 340 F.2d 301, 302 (6th Cir. 1964) ("No case has been cited to us, nor have we found any, where a plaintiff, upon his own motion, was denied the right to dismiss his case with prejudice."). The case is therefore DISMISSED with prejudice as Mr. Olohan requests. Dkt. 137. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 7/24/2024) (vfr) |
|
138 | 138
misc
Letter
Wed 07/24 12:09 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Meghan H. Sullivan dated 07/24/24 re: Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal with Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Document filed by Tiffany Miller..(Sullivan, Meghan) |
|
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Wed 07/24 4:56 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (vfr) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
137 | 137
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 07/23 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Dismissal with Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(2) . Document filed by Ryan Olohan..(Rissmiller, Alex) |