Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10010

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James L Garrity Jr
Case #: 1:22-ap-01175
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2022
Terminated:Dec 10, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Coronado Student Loan Trust
500 Delaware Avenue 11th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Coronado Student Loan Trust
contact info
Defendant
Launch Servicing, LLC
5109 S Broadband Ln Suite 400
Sioux Falls, SD 57108
Represented By
Launch Servicing, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jayme D. Joseph
3663 Boller Ave # 1
Bronx, NY 10466
Represented By
Natalie Jean-Baptiste
Law Office Of Natalie Jean-Baptiste, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Sunday, December 10, 2023
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Sun 12/10 11:57 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1175 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
20 20 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 12/06 11:00 AM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 12/4/2023 Dismissing this Adversary Proceeding. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
19 19 misc Status Report Tue 11/07 12:03 PM
Status Report Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Coronado Student Loan Trust, Launch Servicing, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
18 18 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 09/07 3:24 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing re: Pre-Trial Conference filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Coronado Student Loan Trust, Launch Servicing, LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2023 (check with court for location) (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
17 17 misc Status Report Wed 08/30 1:27 PM
Status Report Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Coronado Student Loan Trust, Launch Servicing, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Memorandum Endorsed Order Wed 08/09 9:14 AM
Memorandum Endorsed Order signed on 8/9/2023 Re: Request for Adjournment. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
15 15 misc Status Report Tue 08/08 8:30 AM
Status Report Pre-Trail Conference Filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Coronado Student Loan Trust, Launch Servicing, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Memorandum Endorsed Order Wed 06/21 1:25 PM
Memorandum Endorsed Order signed on 6/20/2023 Re: Request for Adjournment. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, June 15, 2023
13 13 misc Status Report Thu 06/15 12:19 PM
Status Report Pre-Trail Conference Filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Coronado Student Loan Trust, Launch Servicing, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Memorandum Endorsed Order Thu 04/20 11:42 AM
Memorandum Endorsed Order signed on 4/20/2023 Re: Request for Adjournment. Related [+] (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, April 13, 2023
11 11 misc Status Report Thu 04/13 9:20 AM
Status Report Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Coronado Student Loan Trust, Launch Servicing, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/06 3:42 PM
Minutes of Proceedings signed on 3/2/2023 Re: Hearing held on 2/14/2023. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 21, 2023
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing - Blank Notice Sun 01/22 12:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] . Notice Date 01/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Thursday, January 19, 2023
8 8 misc Blank Notice (BNC) Thu 01/19 1:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment. (Rodriguez, Willie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
7 7 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 01/04 11:57 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Launch Servicing, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer None Wed 01/04 11:48 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Launch Servicing, LLC. (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 01/04 10:21 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Coronado Student Loan Trust. (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer None Wed 01/04 10:19 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Geoffrey J. Peters on behalf of Coronado Student Loan Trust. (Peters, Geoffrey)
Related: [-] 1 1
Monday, December 12, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 4:11 PM
Certificate of Service Summons & Complaint Related [+] Filed by Natalie Jean-Baptiste on behalf of Jayme D. Joseph. (Jean-Baptiste, Natalie)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Monday, December 05, 2022
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 12/05 10:59 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/24/2023 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (JLG), Answer due by 1/4/2023, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 11/30 9:44 PM
Adversary case 22-01175 Complaint against Coronado Student Loan Trust, Launch Servicing, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) Filed by Natalie Jean-Baptiste on behalf of Jayme D. Joseph. (Jean-Baptiste, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet