New York Western District Court
Case #: 1:22-mj-01116
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2022
Terminated:Dec 01, 2022
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kenny Adalid Quintero (1)
Terminated: 12/01/2022
Represented By
Brian P. Comerford
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Terminated: 12/01/2022
Represented By
Russell T. Ippolito, Jr.
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Buffalo
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/29/2025 9:20 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
Set Hearings as to Kenny Adalid Quintero: Initial Appearance/Rule 5-out set for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM in Genesee Courtroom, 6th Floor West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. (EG)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Kenny Adalid Quintero (EG)
Related: [-]