Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Algenon L Marbley
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:22-cv-04263
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 31, 2023 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
John Goodman
Defendant
Garret Miller
Defendant
Ruscilli Construction Co., LLC
Defendant
Steve Totzke
Plaintiff
John Chomet
Represented By
Gregory T. Shumaker
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info
Trisha M. Breedlove
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 31, 2023
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/31 1:40 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/30 4:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff John Chomet. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 03/30 4:08 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for want of prosecution WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order unless he has applied for an entry of default from the Clerk in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/30/2023. (daf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/28 10:12 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ruscilli Construction Co., LLC on 12/7/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/28 10:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Steve Totzke on 12/7/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/28 10:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to John Goodman on 12/7/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/28 10:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Garret Miller on 12/7/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/02 2:48 PM
Summons Issued as to John Goodman, Garret Miller, Ruscilli Construction Co., LLC, Steve Totzke. (jlk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/02 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9163795), filed by John Chomet. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form Summons x5,
Att: 3 Exhibit Right to Sue