Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Greg Gerard Guidry
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:22-cv-04978
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2022
Terminated:Sep 08, 2023
Case in other court:Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, 202210329
Last checked: Saturday Jun 03, 2023 4:41 AM CDT
Defendant
GEICO Insurance Company
Represented By
James J. Young, IV
Barry & Co, LLC
contact info
Defendant
GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By
William B. Scott
Barry, Rome & Scott
contact info
James J. Young, IV
Barry & Co, LLC
contact info
Stephen R. Barry
Barry & Company LLC
contact info
Daphne P. McNutt
Barry & Piccione (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Elvin Monteleone
Represented By
Brian G. Birdsall
Brian G. Birdsall, LLC
contact info
Caffery H. Jackson
Brian G. Birdsall, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Janet H. Monteleone
Represented By
Brian G. Birdsall
Brian G. Birdsall, LLC
contact info
Caffery H. Jackson
Brian G. Birdsall, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 10/10 2:47 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above entitled and numbered cause be and the same is hereby dismissed, with full prejudice, each pa1ty to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 10/10/2023. (js)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 10/10 11:59 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re18 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date. (js)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
18 18 motion Dismiss Mon 10/09 5:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by GEICO Casualty Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/25/2023.(Young, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
Friday, September 08, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/08 2:34 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs, but without prejudice to the right upon good cause shown, to reopen or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated within sixty (60) days. During this sixty-day period, the Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, including enforcing the settlement agreement entered into by the parties. COUNSEL ARE REMINDED THAT, IF WITNESSES HAVE BEEN SUBPOENAED, EVERY WITNESS MUST BE NOTIFIED BY COUNSEL NOT TO APPEAR. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/08/2023.(js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/15 9:47 AM
ORDER As previously set forth in the Order (R. Doc. 8), counsel for the parties are instructed to contact the assigned Magistrate Judge six weeks prior to the pretrial conference for purposes of scheduling a settlement conference which should be held within two weeks prior to the pretrial conference. The pretrial conference is currently set for September 21, 2023. There is no indication in the record that the parties have made any effort to schedule a settlement conference. Contact the assigned Magistrate Judge immediately for purposes of scheduling a settlement conference to take place in advance of the pretrial conference or provide written reasons why the parties have failed to do so on or before AUGUST 22, 2023. Issued by Clerk for the Court. (dp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
15 15 trial Witness and Exhibit List Mon 07/24 3:45 PM
First Witness and Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs. (Birdsall, Brian)
Related: [-]
14 14 trial Witness and Exhibit List Mon 07/24 1:16 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by GEICO Casualty Company. (Young, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
13 13 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Fri 05/12 9:40 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re11 Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint),12 Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint). Documents have been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP. (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
12 12 discov Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint) Thu 05/11 1:12 PM
Return of Service of Subpoena for Records served on New Orleans EMS on 05/08/2023 by GEICO Casualty Company.(Young, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint) Thu 05/11 1:11 PM
Return of Service of Subpoena for Records to Touro Infirmary served on Touro Infirmary Hospital on 05/08/2023 by GEICO Casualty Company.(Young, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
10 10 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Mon 05/08 1:32 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re9 Notice (Other). Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Status Report. Clerk took corrective action. (js)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/08 10:32 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Elvin Monteleone, Janet H. Monteleone, GEICO Casualty Company. (Birdsall, Brian) Modified text/filers on 5/8/2023 (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/08 4:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 8/7/2023. Issued by Clerk for the Court.(dp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Friday, March 03, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Set Hearings Fri 03/03 10:40 AM
NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2023 12:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Fri 02/10 2:03 PM
GEICO Casualty Company's ANSWER to5 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by GEICO Casualty Company.(Young, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Removal Wed 01/04 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2022-10329 L6 (Fee previously paid) filed by GEICO Casualty Company.(Barry, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1
Monday, December 12, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 12/12 2:08 PM
Notice of Compliance to Court Directive 28 USC 1447(b) by GEICO Casualty Company re3 Order.(Young, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
3 3 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/06 11:46 AM
Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re:1 Notice of Removal filed by GEICO Casualty Company. By the Clerk. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Mon 12/05 4:10 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs notice Notice of Removal Mon 12/05 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 202210329 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9685268) filed by GEICO Insurance Company.Attorney James J. Young, IV added to party GEICO Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Young, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet