Statum v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barry A Bryant |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-03069 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Relief
Thu 07/20 4:16 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY FILED FOR ECF PURPOSES ONLY. (bjb) |
|
19 | 19
order
Judgment - SSA
Thu 07/20 4:02 PM
JUDGMENT AFFIRMING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER and Plaintiff's case is dismissed with prejudice as set forth in the18 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on July 20, 2023. (bjb) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Relief
Thu 07/20 3:59 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on July 20, 2023. (bjb) Modified on 7/20/2023 (bjb) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Govt)
Tue 05/23 12:16 PM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Wirmani, Tracey) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/05 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Wirmani on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Wirmani, Tracey) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff)
Fri 04/28 11:33 AM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Pete Statum. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 04/26 4:13 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File; (Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/4/2023). Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 26, 2023. (tg) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 04/26 2:08 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief by Pete Statum. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 03/14 8:20 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File (Plaintiff's Brief due by 4/27/2023). Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 14, 2023. (bjb) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 03/13 4:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Pete Statum. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Fri 02/24 7:48 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/27/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 24, 2023. (mfj) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Social Security Transcript
Thu 02/23 9:32 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Taylor, Candace) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 02/06 8:37 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 3/20/2023.( Administrative Record due by 3/20/2023). Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 6, 2023. (bjb) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 02/03 3:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint, by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Curtis, Kizuwanda) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
utility
Memo of Reassignment
Thu 01/19 10:39 AM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Barry A Bryant. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (hnc) |
||
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 12/12 9:33 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit and granting3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on the Social Security Administration Commissioner and the US Attorney for the Western District/Arkansas via notice of electronic filing and without prepayment of fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to note the date of service on the docket sheet. Further, the Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 12, 2022. (cla) |
||
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Mon 12/12 9:51 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service: Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 12/7/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (bjb) |
||
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Wed 12/07 1:03 PM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Pete Statum. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Wed 12/07 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 12/21/2022.(bjb) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 12/07 9:01 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pete Statum. (Spencer, Frederick) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/07 8:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Pete Statum.(Spencer, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - redacted Notice of Decision - Unfavorable, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redacted Notice of Appeals Council Action, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 12/06 1:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Pete Statum. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tg) |