Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Susan O Hickey
Case #: 1:22-cv-01069
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2022
Terminated:Jan 23, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 21, 2023 5:05 AM CST
Defendant
State of Arkansas
Represented By
Brooks Christopher White
Arkansas Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Arkansas Game and Fish Commission
Represented By
James Felix Goodhart
Arkansas Game And Fish Commission
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven W. Keaster
Represented By
Floyd Mattison Thomas, III
F. Mattison Thomas, Iii
contact info

GPO Jan 23 2023
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Case. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 23, 2023.(mll)

Docket last updated: 01/30/2023 11:59 PM CST
Monday, January 23, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Mon 01/23 2:54 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Dismiss Case. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 23, 2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
18 18 motion Dismiss Case Fri 01/20 11:59 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Steven W. Keaster. (Thomas, III, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/06 4:35 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's response due on or before 1/20/2022. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 6, 2023.(mll)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Initial Scheduling Order Fri 01/06 10:56 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 2/3/2023. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 2/10/2023. Jury Trial set for 2/5/2024 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 6, 2023. (rwg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/05 1:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Steven W. Keaster. (Thomas, III, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
14 14 service Summons Issued Thu 12/29 3:06 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Arkansas Game and Fish Commission and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
Related: [-]
13 13 5 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Thu 12/29 10:16 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by State of Arkansas. (White, Brooks)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 12/29 10:15 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by State of Arkansas. (White, Brooks)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/29 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks Christopher White on behalf of State of Arkansas. (White, Brooks)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Requested Thu 12/29 9:26 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Austin Booth for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Thomas, III, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
9 9 8 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Thu 12/22 11:57 AM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Arkansas Game and Fish Commission. (Goodhart, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 12/22 11:53 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Arkansas Game and Fish Commission.(Goodhart, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/22 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Felix Goodhart on behalf of Arkansas Game and Fish Commission. (Goodhart, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 12/08 9:09 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Arkansas Game and Fish Commission, State of Arkansas and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
5 5 service Summons Requested Wed 12/07 2:04 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Thomas, III, Floyd)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Requested Wed 12/07 1:54 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Thomas, III, Floyd)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Wed 12/07 10:28 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
Related: [-]
notice Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee Wed 12/07 10:26 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/9/2022.(mll)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Submitted Wed 12/07 11:16 AM
Complaint filing fee paid re2 Complaint, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2698577.. (Thomas, III, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 12/06 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arkansas Game and Fish Commission, State of Arkansas, filed by Steven W. Keaster.(Thomas, III, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 2 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 12/06 4:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Steven W. Keaster. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents. If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3).(mll)
Related: [-]