Member Case
Lead case is: 4:22-bk-43840

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:22-bk-43839
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2022
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Plan Confirmed:Jun 02, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Veripac, LLC
4765 Earth City Expy
Bridgeton, MO 63044-3827
Represented By
Robert E. Eggmann
Carmody Macdonald P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102


Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
238 238 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/07 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/07/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 237
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
237 237 order Final Decree Wed 03/05 10:32 AM
Final Decree . (bai, j)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 03/05 10:52 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (bai, j)
Related: [-]